Brian Whitaker v. NK Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: NK Properties, LLC, GR Clothing Group, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv06087
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant NK Properties, LLC. (Attorney Saman Manavi added to party NK Properties, LLC(pty:dft)) (Manavi, Saman)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant GR Clothing Group, Inc.. (Attorney Saman Manavi added to party GR Clothing Group, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Manavi, Saman)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #12 , Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #11 served on 8/18/19. (Carson, Chris)
August 24, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plantiff Brian Whitaker. upon GR Clothing Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Saman Manavi. (Handy, Russell)
August 24, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plantiff Brian Whitaker. upon NK Properties, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Saman Manavi. (Handy, Russell)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 * WITHDRAWN * FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, GR Clothing Group, Inc., NK Properties, LLC amending Amended Complaint/Petition #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker(Handy, Russell) Modified on 9/9/2019 (gk).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06087 AB(FFMx). (rn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant GR Clothing Group, Inc., NK Properties, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker(Handy, Russell)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant NK Properties, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Peyman Kohanzadeh in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants GR Clothing Group, Inc., NK Properties, LLC. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24088504 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. NK Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NK Properties, LLC
Represented By: Saman Manavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GR Clothing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Saman Manavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?