Brian Matian et al v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Nicole Matian and Babak Matian
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06102
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 10/21/2019 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Cronin, Colin)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nicole Matian and Babak Matian in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/14/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, (Cronin, Colin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Cronin, Colin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV20854 Receipt No: 0973-24091388 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Colin Patrick Cronin added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Cronin, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Matian et al v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Matian
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babak Matian
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Colin Patrick Cronin
Represented By: Brian Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?