Merkamerica Inc. v. Eiland Glover et al
Plaintiff: Merkamerica Inc.
Defendant: Eiland Glover, John Reitano, Kowala SEZC, Walker Willse, Does 1-100 and DOES 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06111
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE #9 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Upon consideration of the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time and for good cause shown therein, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby stipulated and agreed by the parties as follows: 1. The time for defendants Eiland Glover, John Reitano, Walker Willse, and Kowala SEZC, a Cayman Islands special economic zone company, to respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the new date of October 11, 2019. 2. The hearing date on any motion defendants may file in response to the Complaint will be set for Monday, December 2, 2019, which is an open hearing date on the Court's calendar. Plaintiff will file any opposition on or before November 4, 2019, and defendants will file any reply on or before November 11, 2019. (bm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc., upon Defendant Walker Willse served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Walker Willse, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Case, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc., upon Defendant John Reitano served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Reitano, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Case, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc., upon Defendant Eiland Glover served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eiland Glover, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Case, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 11, 2019 filed by Defendants Eiland Glover, Kowala SEZC, John Reitano, Walker Willse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Joseph Alexander Little, IV added to party Eiland Glover(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Alexander Little, IV added to party Kowala SEZC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Alexander Little, IV added to party John Reitano(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Alexander Little, IV added to party Walker Willse(pty:dft))(Little, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Eiland Glover, Kowala SEZC, John Reitano and Walker Willse. (jtil)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc.. (Case, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc., (Case, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc.. (Case, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24092895 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Merkamerica Inc.. (Attorney John Allen Case, Jr added to party Merkamerica Inc.(pty:pla))(Case, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merkamerica Inc. v. Eiland Glover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eiland Glover
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Little, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Reitano
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Little, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kowala SEZC
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Little, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Willse
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Little, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merkamerica Inc.
Represented By: John Allen Case, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?