Faramarz Naeim v. Robert L. Wilkie et al
Plaintiff: Faramarz Naeim
Defendant: Secretary ROBERT L. WILKIE, MICHAEL LEWIS, Acting Director ROBERT W. MCKENRICK, ELIZABETH WANG-RODRIGUEZ, Robert W. McKenrick, Does 1 through 10 and Robert L. Wilkie
Case Number: 2:2019cv06126
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim, upon Defendant Robert L. Wilkie served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia De La Rosa, Legal Assistant. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Cyrus)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim, upon Defendant Robert W. McKenrick served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia De La Rosa, Legal Assistant. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Cyrus)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,,, #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Summons served upon the parties is un issued with no signature The proof of Service of Summons and Complaint needs to be served with the Summons that was issued by the clerk on 7/19/2019, document 7 Other error(s) with document(s): Please refile the Proof of Service of Summons and Complaints individually as to each defendant. (shb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim, upon Defendant Michael Lewis served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Robert W. McKenrick served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Elizabeth Wang-Rodriguez served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Robert L. Wilkie served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia De La Rosa, Legal Assistant. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to David Burroughs, Office Manager. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Cyrus)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Michael Lewis, Robert W. McKenrick, Elizabeth Wang-Rodriguez, Robert L. Wilkie. (shb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim. (Shahriari, Cyrus)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim, (Shahriari, Cyrus)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim. (Shahriari, Cyrus)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24094520 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Faramarz Naeim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Cyrus E Shahriari added to party Faramarz Naeim(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faramarz Naeim v. Robert L. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary ROBERT L. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director ROBERT W. MCKENRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH WANG-RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. McKenrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faramarz Naeim
Represented By: Cyrus E Shahriari
Represented By: Morgan E Pietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?