David Warren v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: David Warren
Defendant: Saul Andrews and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv06228
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:19-cv-06228 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff David Warren. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Ruzin, Irene)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Warren, upon Defendant Saul Andrews served on 7/29/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff David Warren. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Saul Andrews. (ch)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. #5 (ch)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff David Warren. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff David Warren, (Ruzin, Irene)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Warren. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff David Warren. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff David Warren. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party David Warren(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Warren v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Warren
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?