Sally Motodani v. The Western Union Company
Plaintiff: Sally Motodani
Defendant: The Western Union Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv06418
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant The Western Union Company. (Green, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Western Union Company answer now due 9/25/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by defendant The Western Union Company.(Green, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Western Union Company, identifying Western Union Financial Services, Inc.. (Attorney Andrew Scott Green added to party The Western Union Company(pty:dft))(Green, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Sally Motodani, Summons and Certification of Notice of Interested Parties served on 7/24/19. (esa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Sally Motodani. (esa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The Western Union Company. (esa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTION RELIEF against defendant The Western Union Company.Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiff Sally Motodani. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sally Motodani v. The Western Union Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Western Union Company
Represented By: Andrew Scott Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Motodani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?