Bradford Budd et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Bradford Budd and Ramona Budd
Defendant: Southern California Edison Company, C.W. Driver, Inc., Torrance Refining Company LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC, Air and Liquid Systems Corp., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Ultramar, Inc, The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California, Crane Co., Does 1-10 (11-500 terminated), McNally Industries, Inc., Southwest Marine, Inc., 3M Company, Chevron USA Inc., Crown Cork and Seal, Inc., Elliott Company, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, ConocoPhillips Company, General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Carrier Corporation, SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Parsons Government Services Inc., Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, Flowserve Corporation, Atlantic Richfield Company, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., City of Pasadena Department of Water and Power, Metalclad Insulation LLC, BW IP, Inc., Valero Energy Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, Fluor Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC., World Oil Corp., City of Burbank Department of Water and Power, Shell Oil Company, Sequoia Ventures, Inc., CBS Corporation and Mueller Co. LLC
Petitioner: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06420
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 209 Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 8/23/19 (lc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 208 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court grants Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application and REMANDS this action to Los Angeles Superior Court. The Court declines to award attorney fees or impose sanctions on Foster Wheeler or its counsel. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
August 21, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REMANDING THIS MATTER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. (Cappy, Rod)
August 21, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC. FKA KOPPERS COMPANY, INC. NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REMANDING THIS MATTER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT filed by Defendant Beazer East, Inc.. (Goldberg, Karen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #164 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 21, 2019 Filing 203 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Remand filed by Defendant C.W. Driver, Inc.. (Chusid, Bruce)
August 20, 2019 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Jamie O. Norman in compliance with local rules governing electronic filing filed by Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.. (Norman, Jamie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 201 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc., identifying Baltimore Aircoil Company, and Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.. (Norman, Jamie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 200 NOTICE filed by Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.. of Filing Answer in State Court (Norman, Jamie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jamie Oehrle Norman on behalf of Defendant Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc. (Attorney Jamie Oehrle Norman added to party Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Norman, Jamie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 198 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #171 , Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Park, Charles)
August 20, 2019 Filing 197 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Uchida, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 196 Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Notice of Interested Parties - Corporate Disclosure Statement NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, identifying The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Uchida, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David M Uchida on behalf of Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Attorney David M Uchida added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Uchida, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 194 EX PARTE APPLICATION to ALLOW APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL AT SEPTEMBER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Charles S. Bishop, #3 Proposed Order) (Bishop, Charles)
August 20, 2019 Filing 193 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 , First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #171 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CHARLES S. PARK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REMANDING THIS MATTER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT AND FOR SANCTIONS, #2 Affidavit RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AFFIDAVIT OF J. THOMAS SCHROPPE, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit OF SERVICE)(Park, Charles)
August 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Certainteed Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT (7/24/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #189 .) (iv)
August 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (7/25/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #188 .) filed by Defendant (iv)
August 19, 2019 UNCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Certainteed Corporation. (Dated 7/24/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #182 . (iv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 192 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #95 filed by Plaintiff Bradford Budd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tenny Mirzayan, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 19, 2019 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sequoia Ventures, Inc., identifying Parent company of Sequoia Ventures Inc. is Bechtel Corporation; Parent company of Bechtel Corporation is Bechtel Group, Inc., and no publically held company owns 10% or more of Bechtel Group, Inc.s stock. (Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT VALERO ENERGY CORPORATION #108 by Judge John F. Walter. All claims against defendant Valero Energy Corporation, are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 41(a)(2). Pursuant to stipulation, the parties shall bear their own costs. (iv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE filed by Defendant Sequoia Ventures, Inc.. Re-Filing State Court Answer (Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Bishop, Charles)
August 19, 2019 Filing 187 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph L Greenslade counsel for Defendant Sequoia Ventures, Inc.. Adding Joseph L. Greenslade as counsel of record for Sequoia Ventures Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sequoia Ventures Inc.. (Attorney Joseph L Greenslade added to party Sequoia Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft))(Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, identifying MSA Safety Incorporated. (Attorney Charles S Bishop added to party Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Bishop, Charles)
August 19, 2019 Filing 185 DECLARATION of Charles S. Bishop AS LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FOR MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, LLC RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (Bishop, Charles)
August 19, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Certainteed Corporation. correcting Notice (Other) #182 (Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 183 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Certainteed Corporation, identifying CertainTeed Corporation is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France and Wendel Group, Paris, France owns more than 10% of the stock of Compagnie de Saint-Gobain. (Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 182 NOTICE filed by Defendant Certainteed Corporation. Re-Filing State Court Answer (Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 181 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph L Greenslade counsel for Defendant Certainteed Corporation. Adding Joseph L. Greenslade as counsel of record for CertainTeed Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CertainTeed Corporation. (Attorney Joseph L Greenslade added to party Certainteed Corporation(pty:dft))(Greenslade, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 180 DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Parsons Government Services Inc. (Hopwood, Beth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 179 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Beth C Hopwood counsel for Defendant Parsons Government Services Inc.. Adding Beth C. Hopwood as counsel of record for PARSONS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant PARSONS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Attorney Beth C Hopwood added to party Parsons Government Services Inc.(pty:dft))(Hopwood, Beth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 178 DECLARATION of Beth C. Hopwood OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Parsons Government Services Inc.. (Hopwood, Beth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 177 DECLARATION of T. Eric Sun LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Sun, Tsun-Chi)
August 19, 2019 Filing 176 Amendment to Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 Declaration With Exhibits Attached filed by Plaintiff Bradford Budd. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service by Facsimile before 9am)(Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 19, 2019 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, re Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #172 By Facsimile and Electronic Service served on 08/19/2019 before 9:00 a.m.. (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 19, 2019 Filing 174 Second APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from September 9, 2019 to September 30, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #74 filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd. Application set for hearing on 8/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of Service) (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 19, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Bradford Budd. correcting First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #171 (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 19, 2019 Filing 172 Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Tenny Mirzayan, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Supplement Objections to Declaration of J. Thomas Schroppe, #10 Proposed Order re: Schroppe, #11 Supplement Certificate of Service, #12 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand) (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 18, 2019 Filing 171 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Tenny Mirzayan, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Supplement Objections to Declaration of J. Thomas Schroppe, #11 Proposed Order re: Schroppe, #12 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Ferguson Enterprises, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (Dated 7/25/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #161 .) filed by Defendant (iv)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND OPPOSITION AND REPLY DUE DATES #157 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. Without Prejudice to Refiling After the Plaintiff's File Their Motion for Remand. (iv)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER REGARDING ULTRAMAR, INC. #160 by Judge John F. Walter. Ultramar, Inc. will now appear in place of Doe No. 2 and Doe No. 302. (iv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 168 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Meyers, Lesa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lesa M Meyers on behalf of Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Attorney Lesa M Meyers added to party Marathon Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft))(Meyers, Lesa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 166 DECLARATION of Florence A. McClain LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Meyers, Lesa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 165 DECLARATION of John A. Kaniewski Lead Trial Counsel for P.E. O'Hair & Co. Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, LLC. (Rankin, Jennifer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant P.E. O'Hair & Co. filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, LLC. (Rankin, Jennifer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #158 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page with case number is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 162 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, (Attorney Jennifer Hunt Rankin added to party Ferguson Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Rankin, Jennifer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Re-Filing of State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant P.E. O'Hair & Co. filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, LLC. (Rankin, Jennifer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 160 STIPULATION for Order Ultramar, Inc. to appear in place of Doe No. 2 and Doe No. 302 filed by Defendant Does. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Marla Talina Almazan added to party Does(pty:dft))(Almazan, Marla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 159 OPPOSITION to First APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from September 9, 2019 to September 23, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B) #157 filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. (Lee, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plainitffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd, re First APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from September 9, 2019 to September 23, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B) #157 served on 08/15/2019. (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 15, 2019 Filing 157 First APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from September 9, 2019 to September 23, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #95 , Notice (Other) #155 filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd. Application set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 15, 2019 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd, re Notice (Other) #155 Notice of Waiver - Foster Wheeler served on 08/15/2019. (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 15, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE Notice of Waiver of 28 U.S.C. 1442(a)(1) Claims as to Foster Wheeler filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd. (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER REGARDING EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION #147 by Judge John F. Walter. ExxonMobil Oil Corporation will now appear in the place of Exxon Mobil Corporation. (iv)
August 14, 2019 Filing 153 DECLARATION of of Lead Trial Counsel Amended Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electric Filing filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Sandoval, Arturo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Denfendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., (Sandoval, Arturo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 151 Initial DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. (Sandoval, Arturo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 150 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Sandoval, Arturo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 149 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc..(Sandoval, Arturo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Arturo E Sandoval on behalf of Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. (Attorney Arturo E Sandoval added to party Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sandoval, Arturo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 147 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Exxonmobil Oil Corporation filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Jayme)
August 13, 2019 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Frank D. Pond re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Smith, Harrison)
August 13, 2019 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Frank D. Pond re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant McNally Industries, Inc.. (Smith, Harrison)
August 13, 2019 Filing 144 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Southwest Marine, Inc. (Watson, Alan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 143 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Defendant Southwest Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Attorney Alan J Watson added to party Southwest Marine, Inc.(pty:dft))(Watson, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Suzanna L. Minasian Lead Trial Counsel for Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and its wholly owned subsidiaries re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc.. (Minasian, Suzanna)
August 12, 2019 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Suzanna L. Minasian Lead Trial Counsel for Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Minasian, Suzanna)
August 12, 2019 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Carmen Santana Lead Trial Counsel for Defendant Fluor Corporation re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Fluor Corporation. (Santana, Carmen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Robert H. Baronian Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc.. (Baronian, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA Inc. (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Chevron USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 137 DECLARATION of Jeremy D. Milbrodt Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Milbrodt, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Milbrodt, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Joseph Duffy Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (Duffy, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Filing 134 DECLARATION of Mark D. Sayre , Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
August 12, 2019 Filing 133 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Adding Mark D. Sayre as counsel of record for Defendant, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
August 12, 2019 Filing 132 DECLARATION of Tenny Mirzayan Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Bradford Budd. (Mirzayan, Tenny)
August 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Notice of Removal #1 filed by defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corp. (FILED IN STATE COURT July 25, 2019) SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #119 . (iv)
August 9, 2019 Filing 131 DECLARATION of John P. Katerndahl AS LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC. FKA KOPPERS COMPANY, INC. RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Beazer East, Inc.. (Katerndahl, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Jerry C. Popovich AS LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. (Popovich, Jerry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 129 DECLARATION of LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant World Oil Corp.. (O'Brien, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Anthony D. Brosamle Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Brosamle, Anthony)
August 9, 2019 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Edward R. Hugo re Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Edward R. Hugo re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
August 9, 2019 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Bobbie Rae Bailey Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and IMO Holdings, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 122 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 121 FRCP Rule 7.1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corp., identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, a publicly-traded company, Utica National Insurance Group, Resolute Management Inc., Fireman's Fund and Liberty Mutual. (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corp.(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Rod J. Cappy as Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant C.W. Driver, Inc.. (Chusid, Bruce)
August 9, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE filed by defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corp.. OF REFILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer to Complaint)(Powell, Glen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 118 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert C O'Brien counsel for Defendant World Oil Corp.. Adding Robert C. O'Brien as counsel of record for Defendant WORLD OIL CORP. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant WORLD OIL CORP.. (Attorney Robert C O'Brien added to party World Oil Corp.(pty:dft))(O'Brien, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Katherine C. Elford Lead Trial Counsel For Defendant Honeywell International Inc. Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Elford, Katherine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Bradford J. DeJardin Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (DeJardin, Bradford)
August 9, 2019 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Jennifer J. Lee Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California. (Lee, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Jayme C. Long Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Long, Jayme)
August 9, 2019 Filing 113 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer J Lee counsel for Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California. Adding Jennifer J. Lee as counsel of record for The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California. (Attorney Jennifer J Lee added to party The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(Lee, Jennifer)
August 8, 2019 Filing 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation identifying FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION as Corporate Parent. (Yuen, Nicole)
August 8, 2019 Filing 111 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by FLOWSERVE US, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION Fluor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE COURT ANSWER)(Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Fluor Corporation(pty:dft))(Yuen, Nicole)
August 8, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole Brown Yuen on behalf of Defendant Flowserve Corporation (Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Flowserve Corporation(pty:dft))(Yuen, Nicole)
August 8, 2019 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Mueller Co. LLC. (Sun, Tsun-Chi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 108 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Valero Energy Corp. filed by Defendant Valero Energy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Marla Talina Almazan added to party Valero Energy Corp.(pty:dft))(Almazan, Marla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE Amended Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Fluor Corporation. (Bellow, Rebecca)
August 8, 2019 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Ross M. Petty Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Petty, Ross)
August 8, 2019 Filing 105 LOCAL RULE 7.1.-1 CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, identifying Borg-Warner Inc.. (Cappy, Rod)
August 8, 2019 Filing 104 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC.(Cappy, Rod)
August 8, 2019 Filing 103 DEMAND for Jury Trial Bradford Budd.. (Keller, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 102 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rod J Cappy counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. Adding Rod J. Cappy as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse Tec LLC as Successor-By-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC As Successor-By-Merger To Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Rod J Cappy added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC(pty:dft))(Cappy, Rod)
August 8, 2019 Filing 101 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Stephen Brady counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. Adding Matthew S. Brady as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse Tec LLC as Successor-By-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC As Successor-By-Merger To Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Matthew Stephen Brady added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC(pty:dft))(Brady, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Notice of Removal #1 filed by defendant Elliott Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT July 25, 2019.) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #99 . (iv)
August 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Notice of Removal #1 by defendant World Oil Corp. (FILED IN STATE COURT JULY 25, 2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #86 . (iv)
August 7, 2019 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elliott Company identifying Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE filed by Defendant Elliott Company. Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Answer)(Duffy, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant Elliott Company. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Elliott Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Elliott Company(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 97 DECLARATION of CITY OF BURBANK, erroneously sued and served as CITY OF BURBANK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER In Support of Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #95 DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. (Lee, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 96 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #95 filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lee, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant City of Burbank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIVP. 12(B)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)) (Lee, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 94 STATEMENT JOINT STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 7-3 REGARDING DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power (Lee, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill Alicia Vander Borght counsel for Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. Adding Jill A. Vander Borght as counsel of record for City of Burbank,erroneously sued and served as City of Burbank Department of Water and Power for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CITY OF BURBANK, erroneously sued and served as CITY OF BURBANK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER. (Attorney Jill Alicia Vander Borght added to party City of Burbank Department of Water and Power(pty:dft))(Vander Borght, Jill)
August 7, 2019 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amelia A Albano counsel for Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. Adding Amelia Ann Albano as counsel of record for City of Burbank,erroneously sued and served as City of Burbank Department of Water and Power for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CITY OF BURBANK, erroneously sued and served as CITY OF BURBANK DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER. (Attorney Amelia A Albano added to party City of Burbank Department of Water and Power(pty:dft))(Albano, Amelia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Beazer East, Inc., (Goldberg, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC. FKA KOPPERS COMPANY, INC. NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant Beazer East, Inc..(Goldberg, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 89 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen B Goldberg counsel for Defendant Beazer East, Inc.. Adding Paul J. Gamba as counsel of record for Beazer East Inc. fka Koppers Company, Inc. (Doe 1) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Beazer East, Inc. fka Koppers Company, Inc. (Doe 1). (Goldberg, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen B Goldberg counsel for Defendant Beazer East, Inc.. Adding Karen B. Goldberg as counsel of record for Beazer East Inc. fka Koppers Company, Inc. (Doe 1) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Beazer East, Inc. fka Koppers Company, Inc. (Doe 1). (Attorney Karen B Goldberg added to party Beazer East, Inc.(pty:dft))(Goldberg, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant World Oil Corp., identifying World Oil Corp., World Oil, LLC, and Lunday-Thagard Company, d/b/a World Oil Refining. (Attorney Steven E Bledsoe added to party World Oil Corp.(pty:dft))(Bledsoe, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE filed by Defendant World Oil Corp.. OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINITFFS' UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer to Amended Complaint)(Bledsoe, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 16, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 3, 2019. (iv)
August 7, 2019 Filing 84 Text Entry Only Order DENYING MOTION to Dismiss #74 without prejudice to refiling before Judge Walter in accordance with the local rules and this Court's Standing Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (sr)
August 6, 2019 UNCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Fluor Corporation. (DATED 7/25/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #79 . (iv)
August 6, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andy Justin Goetz on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA Inc. (Goetz, Andy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Howard Schuck on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA Inc. (Schuck, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Crochet, Carla)
August 6, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Fluor Corporation. (Bellow, Rebecca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 78 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Fluor Corporation.. (Bellow, Rebecca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fluor Corporation, identifying Fluor Enterprises. (Bellow, Rebecca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rebecca Anne Bellow on behalf of Defendant Fluor Corporation (Attorney Rebecca Anne Bellow added to party Fluor Corporation(pty:dft))(Bellow, Rebecca)
August 6, 2019 Filing 75 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #74 DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Preliminary Fact Sheet, #2 Claim for Damages, #3 Notice of Late Claim)(Lee, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)) (Lee, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 73 DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANKS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power, (Lee, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 72 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael M Lee counsel for Defendant City of Burbank Department of Water and Power. Adding Michael M. Lee as counsel of record for City of Burbank,erroneously sued and served as City of Burbank Department of Water and Power for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Burbank. (Attorney Michael M Lee added to party City of Burbank Department of Water and Power(pty:dft))(Lee, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel L Keller on behalf of Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd (Keller, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel L Keller on behalf of Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd (Keller, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Mueller Co. LLC (FILED IN STATE COURT July 18, 2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #67 . (iv)
August 5, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant C.W. Driver, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT July 25, 2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #58 . (iv)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06420 JFW(JEMx). (rn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mueller Co. LLC, identifying Mueller Water Products, Inc. (NYSE:MWA). (Attorney Tsun-Chi Eric Sun added to party Mueller Co. LLC(pty:dft))(Sun, Tsun-Chi)
August 5, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE Of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Mueller Co. LLC. (Sun, Tsun-Chi)
August 5, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Defendant Mueller Co. LLC. (Sun, Tsun-Chi)
August 5, 2019 Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Carrier Corporation. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Carrier Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Brosamle, Anthony)
August 5, 2019 Filing 64 Defendant Shell Oil Company's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Shell Petroleum Inc.; Shell Petroleum N.V.; Royal Dutch Shell plc.. (Petty, Ross)
August 5, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation, (Brosamle, Anthony)
August 5, 2019 Filing 62 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation.(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Carrier Corporation(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
August 5, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, FOR PERSONAL INJURIES filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Ross M Petty added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Petty, Ross)
August 5, 2019 Filing 60 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant C.W. Driver, Inc. (Chusid, Bruce)
August 5, 2019 Filing 59 DISCLOSURE of Corporate Ownership filed by Defendant C.W. Driver, Inc. (Chusid, Bruce)
August 5, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE Filing State Court Answer and Request for Jury Trial filed by Defendant C.W. Driver, Inc.. (Chusid, Bruce)
August 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by defendant Chevron USA Inc. [Submitted as an attachment to doc. no. 56](mrgo)
August 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. [Submitted as an attachment to doc. no. 53](mrgo)
August 2, 2019 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc. identifying Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Chevron USA Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Arpi Galfayan on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA Inc. (Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Chevron USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Ingersoll-Rand PLC as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Arpi Galfayan on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Ingersoll-Rand Company(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
August 1, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by defendant FMC Corporation. [Submitted as exhibit 1 to doc. no. 44](mrgo)
August 1, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by defendant McNally Industries, Inc. [Submitted as exhibit 1 to doc. no. 51](mrgo)
August 1, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by defendant BW IP, Inc. [Submitted as Exhibit to doc. no. 45](mrgo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant McNally Industries, Inc.. (Smith, Harrison)
August 1, 2019 Filing 50 DISCLOSURE of Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1, and Civil Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant McNally Industries, Inc. (Smith, Harrison)
August 1, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Harrison Scott Smith on behalf of Defendant McNally Industries, Inc. (Attorney Harrison Scott Smith added to party McNally Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Harrison)
August 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant McNally Industries, Inc. (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party McNally Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant McNally Industries, Inc. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party McNally Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 Defendant BW/IP, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1-1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc., identifying Flowserve Corporation. (Attorney Taline R Gettas added to party BW IP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gettas, Taline)
August 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc.. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES IMPROPERLY NAMED AND SERVED AS BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Answer)(Gettas, Taline)
August 1, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant FMC Corporation. (Smith, Harrison)
August 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc.. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES (Gettas, Taline)
August 1, 2019 Filing 42 DISCLOSURE of Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1, and Civil Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Smith, Harrison)
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Harrison Scott Smith on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Harrison Scott Smith added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Smith, Harrison)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aida Ashouri counsel for Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. Adding Keith M. Ameele as counsel of record for Zurn Industries, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Ashouri, Aida)
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aida Ashouri counsel for Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. Adding Suzanna L. Minasian as counsel of record for Zurn Industries, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Ashouri, Aida)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC, identifying Allstate Insurance. (Ashouri, Aida)
August 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Answer to Amended Complaint)(Attorney Aida Ashouri added to party Zurn Industries, LLC(pty:dft))(Ashouri, Aida)
August 1, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julia M Beckley counsel for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Adding Julia M. Beckley as counsel of record for ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (erroneously sued as "Exxon Mobil Corporation") for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (erroneously sued as "Exxon Mobil Corporation"). (Attorney Julia M Beckley added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft))(Beckley, Julia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jayme C Long counsel for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation. Adding Jayme C. Long as counsel of record for ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (erroneously sued as "Exxon Mobil Corporation") for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (erroneously sued as "Exxon Mobil Corporation"). (Attorney Jayme C Long added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft))(Long, Jayme)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendany Exxon Mobil Corporation, identifying Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London ; Equitas Insurance Limited London Underwriting Centre; Abu Dhabi National Insurance Company; Aetna Casualty & Surety Insurance Company ;Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company; Allianz Versicherungs Ag ;Allstate Insurance Company; American Centennial Insurance Company; American Home Assurance Company; American International Underwriters Insurance Company ;American Manufacturers Mutual Insurance Company; American Motorists Insurance Company; American Re-Insurance Company n/k/a Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. ;AREA International Mandataire General; Arendal Forsikringsselskap A/S; Arig-Arab Insurance Group (B.S.C.); Arkwright-Boston Manufacturers Mutual Insurance Company c/o ProSight Specialty Insurance Group Inc.; Assicurazioni Generali S.P.A.; Associated International Insurance Company; Assurances Generales de France; Atlanta International Insurance Company; Baltica Forsikring; Bayside Reinsurance Company; Beneficial Fire & Casualty Insurance Company; Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania; C.A.M.A.T.; Caisse Industrielle D'Assurance Mutuelle ; California Union Insurance Company n/k/a Century Indemnity; Carolina Casualty Insurance Company; Centennial Insurance Company; Central National Insurance Company of Omaha; Century Indemnity Company; Chasvr; Chicago Insurance Company; Christiania General Insurance Corporation of NY; Christiansands Skibsassauranceforening; Chubb & Son; CNA; Colonia Insurance Company; Commercial Insurance of Newark; Commonwealth Insurance Company; Compagnie de Reassurance D'Ile-de-France, Corifrance; Compagnie Transcontinentale de Reassurance; Continental Assurance Company of London Ltd.; Continental Casualty Company; Continental Insurance Company Ltd.; Corifrance Refer Insurance Sec L'Abeille Paix Reassurances; Dairyland Insurance Company; Eisen & Stahl Re. Ag; Employers Commercial Union Insurance Company; Employers Insurance of Wausau; Employers Mutual Casualty Company; Employers Surplus Lines Insurance Incorporated; Eurinco Allgermeine Versicherungs AK; European General Company Reinsurance of Zurich; Excess Insurance Company Ltd.; Federal Insurance Company Ltd.; Fidelity & Casualty of New York; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; Fireman's Insurance Company of Newark, NJ n/k/a Continental Insurance Company; First State Insurance Company; Forsakrings Ab Atlantica; Forsakrings Ab Njord; General Accident Fire & Life Assurance Corporation Ltd.; Generali; Gerling-Konzem Allegemeine Versicherungs-Atkeinge; Gibraltar Casualty Insurance Company n/k/a Mt. McKinley Insurance Company; Gjensidige Norske Skadeforsikring; Government Employees Insurance Company; Granite State Insurance; Great American Indemnity; Great American Insurance Company; Groupe de Leseleuc (Alsacienne); Groupe Sprinks Reinsurance; Groupement D'Acceptations Maritimes; Hafnia-Skadeforsikrings A/S; Hansa Marine Insurance Company; Harbor Insurance Company; Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company; Imperio Companhia de Seguros; Independence; Instituto de Resseguros do Brasil; Insurance Company of North America; Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (The); International Insurance Company n/k/a TIG Insurance Company; International Surplus Lines Insurance Company n/k/a TIG Insurance Company; Interstate Fire & Casualty Company; La Fonciere Cie D'Assurances; Landmark Insurance Company; Languedoc Societe d'Assurances et de Reassurances; Le Continent Compagnie D'Assurances Contre L'Incendie Les Accidents et Les Risques Divers; Les Reassurances C.O.R.E.F.I.; Lexington Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; L'Independence (De Leseleuc); London and Edinburgh General Insurance Company Ltd.; Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company; Maryland Casualty Company; Missouri General Insurance Company; Munich Reinsurance Company; Mutual Boiler & Machinery; Mutuelle Generale Francaise Accidents Re; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.; Navigators Insurance Company; New England Insurance Company; New Hampshire Insurance Company; New York Marine & General; Newark Reinsurance; Nippon Fire & Marine Insurance Company Ltd.; Norges Brannkasse Mutual (Uni); North River Insurance Company; Northbrook Insurance Company; Northeastern Insurance Company; Pacific Insurance Company; Pennsylvania Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company; Preferred Insurance Company; Preservatrice-Fonciere; Progressive Casualty Insurance Company; Prudential Insurance Company of Great Britain; Prudential Reinsurance Company; Qatar General Insurance and Reinsurance Company; Ranger Insurance Company; Republic Insurance Company; Reserve Insurance Company of Chicago Insurance Company; Riunione Adriatica de Sicurta S.P.A.; Royal Indemnity Insurance Company; Royal Insurance Company (U.K.) Ltd.; Samvirke Skadeforsikring A/S; Seaboard Surety Company n/k/a Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America; Seguros; Skadeforsikringsselskapet Vesta A/S a/k/a Vesta Insurance Company; Skandia International Insurance Corporation; Societa Commerciale de Reassurance; Societe Commerciale de Reassurance (SCOR); St. Katherine Insurance Company Ltd.; St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company; Ste. Lilloise D'Assurances et de Reassurances; Stonewall Insurance Company; Storebrand Norden Insurance Company; Storebrand Skadeforsikring (UNI); Stronghold Insurance Company Ltd.; Sumitomo Marine & Fire Insurance Company Ltd. (The); Swiss Reinsurance Company; Taisho Fire & Marine Insurance Company Ltd.; The American Insurance Company; Tokio Marine & Fire Insurance Company; Travelers Indemnity Company (The); Trygg-Hansa Insurance Company Ltd.; Turegum Insurance Company Ltd.; UnionAmerica Insurance Company; United Fire & Casualty Company; United Reinsurance Corporation of New York; United States Fire Insurance Company; Via Nord Monde; Wausau International; Winterthur Swiss Insurance Company Ltd.; Worcester Insurance Company; Zurich American; Zurich Insurance Company; Zurich International Ltd.; Certain London Market Insurance Companies; A.G.F. Reassurances Compagnie Francaise de Reassurances; Accident & Casualty Insurance Company; Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur n/k/a Partnerre Insurance Company of New York; Agrippina Versicherungs A.G.; Alba General Insurance Company Ltd.; Albion Insurance Company Ltd.; American Foreign Insurance Association; Anglo French Insurance Company Ltd.; Anglo-Saxon Insurance Association Ltd.; Argonaut Insurance Company; Argonaut Northwest Insurance Company; Asia Insurance Company Ltd.; Assicurazioni D'Italia S.A; Association Technique Internationale de Compagnies D'Assurances Maritimes et Transports; Assurance-Compagniet Baltica Skandinavia Aktieselskab; Assurances Generales Belges; Baloise Fire Insurance Company; Baloise Insurance Company Ltd.; Bangkok Insurance Company Ltd.; Bavarian Reinsurance Company Ltd.; Bishopsgate Insurance Company Ltd.; British & Foreign Marine Insurance Company Ltd.; British Aviation Insurance Company Ltd. (The); British Fire Insurance Company Ltd. (The); British Law Insurance Company Ltd.; British Marine Insurance (C.F. & A.U.); Brittany Insurance Company Ltd.; C. A. Parr (Agencies) Ltd.; Chemical Insurance Company Ltd.; Cia Arigcola De Seguros S.A.; CNA Reinsurance of London Ltd.; Compagnia Agricola de Seguros; Cornwall; Dai-Tokyo Insurance Company (Uk) Ltd.; Danish Marine Insurance Company Ltd.; Dansk Soassurance A/S n/k/a Codan A/S; Delta Lloyd Non Life Insurance Company; Delta-Lloyd Schadeversekering N/V; Dominion Insurance Company Ltd.; Edinburgh Assurance Company Ltd.; English & Scottish Insurance Company Ltd.; Fidelidade Insurance Company; Fidelidade Insurance Company of Lisbon; Fine Art & General Insurance Company Ltd.; General Insurance Company Helvetia Ltd. (The); Group Josi Reinsurance Company; Groupe Des Assurances Nationales; Groupement Francais D'Assurances Sa; Hanover Insurance Company (The); Helvetia (Gibbon Group); Helvetia Accident Swiss Insurance Company; Highland Houst; Hodge General & Merchantile Insurance Company Ltd.; Home & Overseas Insurance Company Ltd.; Indemnity Marine Assurance Company Ltd.; INSCO Ltd.; Insurance Company of North America (UK) Ltd.; Italia Assicurazioni S.P.A.; L Brunet; La Concorde Cie D'Assurances Contre Les Risques de Toute Nature S.A.; La Preservatrice Compagnie Anonyme D'Assurances; La Protectrice Compagnie Anonyme D'Assurances A Primes Fixes Contre Les Accidents L'Incendie et Autres Risques Societe Anonyme; La Reunion Europeenne Union Maritime D'Assurances Transports; L'Abeille Paix Reassurances; L'Alsacienne Premiere Societe Alsacienne & Forraine Assurances Contre L'Incendie Les Accidents & Les Risques Divers Societe Mutuelle; Latino Americana de Reaseguros Sociedad Anonima; L'Etoile S.A. Belge D'Assurance; Liverpool Marine & General Insurance Company Ltd.; London Assurance (The); Mutuelle Centrale de Reassurance; National Casualty Insurance Company Ltd.; National Insurance Company of New Zealand; National Surety Corporation of California; New India Assurance Company Ltd.; Nissan Fire & Marine Insurance Company Ltd.; Norman Insurance Company Ltd.; Northern Assurance Company Ltd.; Northern Insurance Company Ltd.; Northern Maritime Insurance Company Ltd.; Norwich Union Fire Insurance Society Ltd.; Oriental Fire & Marine Insurance Company Ltd.; Phoenix Assurance Company Ltd.; Planet Assurance Company Ltd.; Planet Insurance Company Ltd.; Polaris/Norkse Insurance Company Ltd.; Prudential Insurance Company Ltd.; Reaseguradora Nacional de Venezula; Red Sea Insurance Company Ltd.; Rhin et Moselle Assurances Francaise Compagnie Generale D'Assurances et De Reassurance Societe Anonyme; Rhone Mediterranee; River Thames Insurance Company Ltd.; Road Transport & General Insurance Company Ltd.; Royal Insurance Company; Royal Scottish (Uma); Royal Scottish Insurance Company Ltd.; S.A.C.I.A.R.; Scottish Lion Insurance Company Ltd.; Scottish Union & National Insurance Company; Sirius Insurance Company (UK) Ltd.; Skandia Insurance Company Ltd.; Skandia U.K. Insurance Ltd. P.L.C. T A/C; Societe Anonyme Francaise de Reassurances; South British Insurance Company Ltd.; Southern Insurance Com
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, For Personal Injury - Demand For Jury Trial filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Attorney Alexander Beau Giraldo added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft))(Giraldo, Alexander)
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendants Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC; The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Metalclad Insulation LLC; The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California. (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(DeJardin, Bradford)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California, identifying Pep Boys is wholly owned by Icahn Automotive Group LLC, which is wholly owned by Icahn Enterprises L.P.. (Beckley, Julia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, For Personal Injury - Demand For Jury Trial filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California.(Attorney Julia M Beckley added to party The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(Beckley, Julia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying ENTRX LLC (Holding Company); Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group); Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group); Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group); First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group); Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group); Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate); Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group); National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group); American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group); Transport Insurance Company; American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group).. (Beckley, Julia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC.(Attorney Julia M Beckley added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Beckley, Julia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE of STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc..(Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Changing Firm and Address Change to Foley & Mansfield, PLLP, 300 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 2800, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing Email to othomas@foleymansfield.com. Filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Adding Melanie L. Ameele as counsel of record for Defendant, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for Defendant Cleaver-Brook, Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., identifying Cleaver-Brooks Holdings, Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, and Request for Jury Trial filed by Attorney for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Attorney Ovsanna Thomas added to party Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.(pty:dft))(Thomas, Ovsanna)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Glezakos, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips Company, identifying ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Glezakos, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Glezakos, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina M Glezakos counsel for Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. Adding Tina M. Glezakos as counsel of record for ConocoPhillips Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Attorney Christina M Glezakos added to party ConocoPhillips Company(pty:dft))(Glezakos, Christina)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel L Keller on behalf of Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Keller, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel L Keller on behalf of Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Keller, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06420 PA(JEMx). (rn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Foster Wheeler LLC NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC, identifying Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Park counsel for Movant Foster Wheeler, LLC. Adding Charles S. Park as counsel of record for Foster Wheeler LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Park, Charles)
July 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corp., Atlantic Richfield Company, BW IP, Inc., Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, C.W. Driver, Inc., CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Chevron USA Inc., City of Burbank Department of Water and Power, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Pasadena Department of Water and Power, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal, Inc., Does, Elliott Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, FMC Corporation, Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, Flowserve Corporation, Fluor Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC., General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, McNally Industries, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mueller Co. LLC, Parsons Government Services Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Southern California Edison Company, Southwest Marine, Inc., Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc., The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California, Torrance Refining Company LLC, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Valero Energy Corp., World Oil Corp. amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiffs Bradford Budd, Ramona Budd. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, document 1-1 #1 )(lh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR, case number 19STCV18802 Receipt No: 0973-24142598 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit OF SERVICE) (Attorney Charles S Park added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Park, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford Budd et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Budd
Represented By: Daniel L Keller
Represented By: Stephen M Fishback
Represented By: Douglas V Dukelow
Represented By: Tenny Mirzayan
Represented By: John Bruce Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Budd
Represented By: Daniel L Keller
Represented By: Stephen M Fishback
Represented By: Douglas V Dukelow
Represented By: Tenny Mirzayan
Represented By: John Bruce Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Charles S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Edison Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.W. Driver, Inc.
Represented By: Rod J Cappy
Represented By: Alan Scott Goldberg
Represented By: Bruce G Chusid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrance Refining Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Aida Ashouri
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corp.
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultramar, Inc
Represented By: Marla Talina Almazan
Represented By: Trenton Elmer Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny Moe and Jack of California
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Jennifer J Lee
Represented By: Julia M Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 (11-500 terminated)
Represented By: Marla Talina Almazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Harrison Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Alan J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc.
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: David M Uchida
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Aircoil Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Oehrle Norman
Represented By: Ashton S Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Represented By: Karen B Goldberg
Represented By: Paul J Gamba, Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Emily Kate Doty
Represented By: Frederick W Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
Represented By: Charles S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Represented By: Mark D Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons Government Services Inc.
Represented By: Douglas G Wah
Represented By: Beth C Hopwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Joseph L Greenslade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC
Represented By: Jerry C Popovich
Represented By: Rod J Cappy
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Christine L Hawkins
Represented By: Arturo E Sandoval
Represented By: Douglas G Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pasadena Department of Water and Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Julia M Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW IP, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Taline R Gettas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corp.
Represented By: Marla Talina Almazan
Represented By: Trenton Elmer Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Alexander Beau Giraldo
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Represented By: Julia M Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Florence A McClain
Represented By: Lesa M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Harrison Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Kaniewski
Represented By: Jennifer Hunt Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Bellow
Represented By: Carmen Santana
Represented By: Giorgio Odysseus Panagos
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC.
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Charles S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Oil Corp.
Represented By: Timothy Clark Tanner
Represented By: Robert C O'Brien
Represented By: Steven E Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Burbank Department of Water and Power
Represented By: Michael M Lee
Represented By: Jill Alicia Vander Borght
Represented By: Amelia A Albano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Aaron M Brian
Represented By: Ross M Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Joseph L Greenslade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Co. LLC
Represented By: Tsun-Chi Eric Sun
Represented By: Shayan Heidarzadeh
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?