Sergio Javier Saldana v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Sergio Javier Saldana
Defendant: Saul Andrews and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv06481
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO REFILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND REENTER ONTO THE DOCKET WITH CORRECT SERVICE DATE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re: Proof of Service #12 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #13 . It is ORDERED that Plaintiff refile the Proof of Service and reenter the filing onto the docket with the correct service date within seven (7) days of this Court's order. (see document for further details) (hr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. The incorrect service date in indicated in the docket text. The service date according to the document is September 12, 2019. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/12/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Ruzin, Irene)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Saul Andrews. (hr)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. #5 (gr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana, (Ruzin, Irene)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana. (Ruzin, Irene)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Sergio Javier Saldana. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Sergio Javier Saldana(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sergio Javier Saldana v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Javier Saldana
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?