Ofelia Ramirez v. LQ Management, L.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Ofelia Ramirez
Defendant: LQ Management, LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive and LQ Management, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as La Qunita Inn and Suites
Case Number: 2:2019cv06507
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LQ Management, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on July 29, 2019. (Claxton, Linda)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 10/21/ 2019 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
July 26, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant LQ Management, LLC. (Filed in state court 7/24/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
July 26, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS NOTICE executed by Plaintiff Ofelia Ramirez, upon Defendant LQ Management, LLC served on 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporate Creatons, Registered Agent, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
July 26, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, LQ Management, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Ofelia Ramirez. (submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites, (Claxton, Linda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Claxton, Linda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Claxton, Linda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Monica Melancon re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Claxton, Linda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Linda Claxton re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Claxton, Linda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Claxton, Linda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV21485 Receipt No: 0973-24155535 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Linda Claxton added to party LQ Management, L.L.C. dba La Quinta Inn & Suites(pty:dft))(Claxton, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ofelia Ramirez v. LQ Management, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ofelia Ramirez
Represented By: Edwin Pairavi
Represented By: Joshua M Mohrsaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management, LLC
Represented By: Linda Claxton
Represented By: Robert Campbell Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as La Qunita Inn and Suites
Represented By: Linda Claxton
Represented By: Robert Campbell Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?