Charles Butler et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ray Butler and Charles Butler
Defendant: Does 1 through 250, Veterans Administration Hospital Sepulveda and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv06536
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (cw)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. For the reasons stated herein, this case is dismissed for lack of prosecution. Judgment will follow. (cw)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: No later than September 9, 2019, plaintiffs shall file a first amended complaint that sets forth the basis of the courts jurisdiction over this case. Failure to do so shall result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with a court order. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). (lc)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/27/2019. (vdr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Defendants United States of America, Veterans Administration Hospital Sepulveda, Does 1 through 250. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Ray Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Butler et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Administration Hospital Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?