Delilah Preciado v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Delilah Preciado
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation a District of Columbia Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 2:2019cv06687
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley Jane Brick counsel for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Adding Ashley Brick as counsel of record for National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (Attorney Ashley Jane Brick added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation(pty:dft))(Brick, Ashley)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brandie N Charles counsel for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Kimiya Massih is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant. (Charles, Brandie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 served on 08/21/2019. (Charles, Brandie)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-06687 AB(FFMx). (rn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re Reminder Notice to Counsel (CV-14) re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project - optional html form, #8 served on 08/13/2019. (Charles, Brandie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 served on 08/01/2019. (Massih, Kimiya)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation (Massih, Kimiya)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation, identifying Delilah Preciado; National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/ba Amtrak; Matthew E. Roston, Roston Law Group, APC; Littler Mendelson, P.C.. (Massih, Kimiya)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation. (Massih, Kimiya)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation. (Massih, Kimiya)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV22351 Receipt No: 0973-24189404 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abigail Johnson ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Abigail Johnson Declaration ISO Removal, #3 Declaration Declaration of Kimiya Massih ISO Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Kimiya Massih Declaration ISO, #5 Declaration Declaration of Patricia A. Boggs ISO Removal) (Attorney Kimiya Massih added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation, a District of Columbia Corporation(pty:dft))(Massih, Kimiya)
August 1, 2019 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa)
August 1, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Delilah Preciado. (Filed in state court 6/26/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 11) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delilah Preciado v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Brandie N Charles
Represented By: Kimiya Massih
Represented By: Ashley Jane Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation a District of Columbia Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Brandie N Charles
Represented By: Kimiya Massih
Represented By: Ashley Jane Brick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delilah Preciado
Represented By: Matthew Ellsworth Roston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?