Erineo Lomudi Ada v. Ethiopian Airlines
Plaintiff: Erineo Lomudi Ada
Defendant: Ethiopian Airlines and DOES 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06701
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Proof of Service #12 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 9/20/2019. (iv)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads 19STCV17594, but should read CV 19-6701-CJC-AFM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 **STRICKEN** SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Erineo Lomudi Ada, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Setlich, John) Modified on 9/18/2019 Per Response #14 (iv).
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 24, 2019. (gga)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06701 CJC(AFMx). (rn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-06701 CAS(AFMx). (rn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Ethiopian Airlines (Sutherland, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ethiopian Airlines, re Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #4 served on August 8, 2019. (Sutherland, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/8/2019) (hr).
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ethiopian Airlines.(Sutherland, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
August 1, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Erineo Lomudi Ada in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/21/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ethiopian Airlines. (Sutherland, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ethiopian Airlines identifying The Government of the State of Ethiopia as Corporate Parent. (Sutherland, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV17594 with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 08/01/2019, receipt number 26J7O2IM), filed by Defendant Ethiopian Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Assignment, Notice of Case Management Conference, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service (Substitute), #3 Exhibit C - Online Case Summary of Documents Filed) (Attorney Kevin R Sutherland added to party Ethiopian Airlines(pty:dft))(Sutherland, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erineo Lomudi Ada v. Ethiopian Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethiopian Airlines
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Represented By: Autumn Elizabeth Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erineo Lomudi Ada
Represented By: John R Setlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?