Tommy Green et al v. Donna Campagnolo et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Green and Jong Hun Lee
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, LA District Director Donna Campagnolo, Acting Director Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS"), Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Donna Campagnolo
Case Number: 2:2019cv06702
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, #12 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA, #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. MISSING Formal title page and its LR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court and case information Other error(s) with document(s): pdf document information as filed either is missing or not corresponding to the docket text. Note: Court website has proof of service of summons and complaint forms.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Sunghwan Kim (Kim, Sunghwan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Sunghwan Kim (Kim, Sunghwan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS"), United States Department of Homeland Security. (lom)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee., Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Defendants #2-5)(Kim, Sunghwan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee. (Kim, Sunghwan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The civil cover sheet is attached to docket entry no. 4 - incorrect event used. Please add the Judge's initials next to the case number; there is no attachment 1. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Certification & Notice of Interested Parties Certification & Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Kim, Sunghwan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #4 filed by plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee. (Kim, Sunghwan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,, #3 filed by plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee. (Kim, Sunghwan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24191403 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tommy Green, Jong Hun Lee. (Attorney Sunghwan Kim added to party Tommy Green(pty:pla), Attorney Sunghwan Kim added to party Jong Hun Lee(pty:pla))(Kim, Sunghwan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tommy Green et al v. Donna Campagnolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS")
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Green
Represented By: Sunghwan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jong Hun Lee
Represented By: Sunghwan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?