Christopher Helman v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Helman
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation, Does 1-10, inclusive and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Case Number: 2:2019cv06725
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-06725 PSG (ASx). (esa)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: Defendant Health care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve company operating in Illinois as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, has until November 4, 2019 to respond to the Initial Complaint filed by Christopher Helman. re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #14 (vm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 4, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shlesinger, Amir)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Garris, Christian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed Plaintiffs proof of service. (Docket # 9 and 10.) The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 . (vm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Helman, upon Defendant Health Care Service Corporation served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garris, Christian)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Helman, upon Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garris, Christian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Health Care Service Corporation answer now due 10/4/2019; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois answer now due 10/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois.(Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Health Care Service Corporation(pty:dft))(Shlesinger, Amir)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before September 16, 2019. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois, Health Care Service Corporation. (et)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christopher Helman, identifying United Airlines. (Garris, Christian)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christopher Helman. (Garris, Christian)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Helman. (Garris, Christian)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24194941 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christopher Helman. (Attorney Christian J Garris added to party Christopher Helman(pty:pla))(Garris, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Helman v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Helman
Represented By: Christian J Garris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?