George Yang v. Jan Kieleczawa et al
Plaintiff: George Yang
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc. and Jan Kieleczawa
Case Number: 2:2019cv06727
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation #13 : GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that the above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to tolling agreement - attempt to resolve filed by attorney George Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aldover, Ernesto)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Standing Order on Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Service of Standing Order on Plaintiff's Counsel)(Fox, Gerard)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc..(Fox, Gerard)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-06727 VAP(KSx). (rn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc. re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #6 . (Fox, Gerard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
August 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., filed by plaintiff George Yang. (Filed in state court 7/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., a Delaware Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Fox, Gerard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jan Kieleczawa re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Fox, Gerard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, (Fox, Gerard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Jan Kieleczawa, Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Fox, Gerard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV23715 Receipt No: 0973-24195117 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Jan Kieleczawa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Notice of Removal) (Attorney Gerard P Fox added to party Jan Kieleczawa(pty:dft), Attorney Gerard P Fox added to party Wyzer Biosciences, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft))(Fox, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Yang v. Jan Kieleczawa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyzer Biosciences, Inc.
Represented By: Alstyn Bronte Bennett
Represented By: Gerard P Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Kieleczawa
Represented By: Alstyn Bronte Bennett
Represented By: Gerard P Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Yang
Represented By: Ernesto F Aldover, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?