Gonzalo D. Hernandez v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Gonzalo D. Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv06800
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-6800 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, #2 Proof of Service on Chief Regional Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, #3 Proof of Service on US Attorney General, US Dept. of Justice)(McCabe, Patricia)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file1 an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. See Order for details. (dml)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (dml)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez, (McCabe, Patricia)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Gonzalo D. Hernandez. (Attorney Patricia L McCabe added to party Gonzalo D. Hernandez(pty:pla))(McCabe, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalo D. Hernandez v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo D. Hernandez
Represented By: Patricia L McCabe
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?