U.S. Bank National Association v. NBA Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: NBA Automotive, Inc. and NBA Automotive, Inc. doing business as Nissani Bros Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevrolet
Case Number: 2:2019cv06868
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:, Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 ; Motion Related Document, #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Lodging - Document no. 24. Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. Other error(s) with document(s): [Prop] Order - document no. 24 - correct event to use for all [Prop] Order filed as a separate document is Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 2, 2019 Filing 24 [Proposed] Order Granting re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Nissani Bros. Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevroley #20 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Stinson, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Randy T. Manning in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Nissani Bros. Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevroley #20 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Dealer Agreement), #2 Exhibit B (Letter from September 12, 2018), #3 Exhibit C (Letter from March 14, 2019), #4 Exhibit D (Letter from March 14, 2019))(Stinson, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Michael D. Stinson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Nissani Bros. Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevroley #20 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Internal Records Reflecting Time Worked))(Stinson, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Nissani Bros. Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevroley #20 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Stinson, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc., d/b/a Nissani Bros. Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevroley filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Stinson, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #15 . On September 13, 2019, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause requiring Plaintiff to show in writing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Docket No. 15.) Before the Court is Plaintiff's Response. (Docket No. 18.) The Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause. (mrgo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Associationto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #15 (Stinson, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #16 . Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment or, other appropriate dispositive motion on or before October 17, 2019. Failure to file said dispositive motion by October 17, 2019, will result in dismissal without further notice by the Court. (mrgo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to NBA Automotive, Inc. doing business as Nissani Bros Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevrolet. (mrgo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc. filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Stinson In Support of Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association's Application For Entry of Default Against NBA Automotive, Inc.) (Krasovec, Alexandra)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2019.) (mrgo)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, upon Defendant NBA Automotive, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Isner, Agent For Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Krasovec, Alexandra)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Stinson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, designating Alexandra N. Krasovec as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: PETITION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Stinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24256618) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Stinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24256618) filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Krasovec, Alexandra)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant NBA Automotive, Inc. (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association identifying U.S. Bancorp as Corporate Parent. (Krasovec, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, identifying U.S. Bancorp. (Krasovec, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Krasovec, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Krasovec, Alexandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24223965 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Alexandra Nicole Krasovec added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla))(Krasovec, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. NBA Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Krasovec
Represented By: Michael D Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBA Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBA Automotive, Inc. doing business as Nissani Bros Chevrolet and/or Hooman Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?