Andrew S. Nicchitta v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Plaintiff: Andrew S. Nicchitta
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Case Number: 2:2019cv06888
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrew S. Nicchitta, upon Defendant Commissioner of Internal Revenue served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DelaRosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to US Attorney's office, F. De La Rosa. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (yl)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Andrew S. Nicchitta. (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Internal Revenue.Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg,(Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiff Andrew S. Nicchitta. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew S. Nicchitta v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew S. Nicchitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?