Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company v. Helen Sararana
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company and Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Helen Sararana
Cross Defendant: Does 1-15, Inclusive (as to Crossclaim Doc No. 10 filed
Case Number: 2:2019cv06891
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, #10 filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company.(O'Reilly, Theodore)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, CROSSCLAIM against Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company filed by Defendant and Cross-Claimant Helen Sararana.(Attorney Joseph S Fogel added to party Helen Sararana(pty:dft))(Fogel, Joseph)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Helen Sararana served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Helen Sararana in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Helen Sararana. (jtil)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company, identifying Fidelity & Guaranty Life Holdings, Inc., FGL US Holdings Inc., CF Bermuda Holdings Limited and FGL Holdings. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 08/08/2019, receipt number 0973-24227193), filed by plaintiff Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6) (Attorney Theodore O'Reilly added to party Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(O'Reilly, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company v. Helen Sararana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Sararana
Represented By: Joseph S Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Does 1-15, Inclusive (as to Crossclaim Doc No. 10 filed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?