Adalgisa Santos et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Plaintiff: CARL PAUL MAURILUS, Adalgisa Santos and COURTNEY MAINE
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, American Honda Motor Co Inc, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Co, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, Honda Motor Co Ltd, TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC, Toyota Motor Corp, Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Group, Honda R&D Co. Ltd., Honda of America Mfg Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp and Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06895
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court orders this case to be transferred to MDL No. 2905: In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation. Counsel shall refrain from filing any further pleadings or documents in this case as of the date of this Order. All documents shall be filed in MDL No. 2905. Counsel shall refer to the docket of MDL. No. 2905 to obtain the Order with respect to how all documents are to be filed. The Clerk is directed to close this case and transfer the names of all parties and their respective counsel to MDL No. 2905. (cbr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Florida Southern
August 9, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #10 Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 8/7/2019) transferring case to the Central District of California re: MDL 2905 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/07/19 regarding transfer of Case No. 0:19-cv-61174-MGC from Southern District of Florida (Ft Lauderdale). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-2905-JAK-FFMx. (car)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Courtesy Copy of TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 8/7/2019) transferring case to the Central District of California re: MDL 2905 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Courtesy Copy of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, Gary E. Samouris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 re MDL-2905. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Corrected Proof of Service)(mc)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 6/12/2019. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Courtesy Copy of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, Gary E. Samouris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 re MDL-2905. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Corrected Proof of Service)(mc)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Boies, mailing date May 9, 2019, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11627997, filed by CARL PAUL MAURILUS, Adalgisa Santos, COURTNEY MAINE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Heise, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adalgisa Santos et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL PAUL MAURILUS
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adalgisa Santos
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY MAINE
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Mark Jurgen Heise
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of America Mfg Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?