Gary E. Samouris et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gary Samouris, Nida Edith Samson and Mark Altier
Defendant: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation, American Honda Motor Co Inc, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc and TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06896
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 42 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 39 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Michigan Eastern
August 9, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Transfer to the Central District of California for MDL 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 37 MDL Certified Transfer Order to Central District of California for MDL # 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 40 Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 08/07/19 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-11215-MAG-EAS from Eastern District of Michigan (Detroit). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-2905-JAK-FFMx. (car)
August 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs OF JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATIONS DECISION GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Wilcox on behalf of TRW Automotive US, LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation. (Wilcox, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Regan on behalf of TRW Automotive US, LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation. (Regan, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Glick on behalf of TRW Automotive US, LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation. (Glick, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Brown on behalf of TRW Automotive US, LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation. (Brown, Judson) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 36 MDL Certified Transfer Order for MDL # 2905. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULED ORDER To Amend Caption. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Vacating Stipulation and Order (Dkt. #26 ) and Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Striking Stipulation and Order. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 27 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION and Order to Amend Caption by All Plaintiffs (Shea, David) Modified on 6/28/2019 (EKar). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 [VACATED]STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) Modified on 7/1/2019 (EKar). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant American Honda Motor Co Inc's First Responsive Pleading ( Ansert due by 7/19/2019) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Honda Motor Co, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co, Inc.. (Mattson, Eric) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Donnini on behalf of American Honda Motor Co, Inc.. (Donnini, George) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Gilford on behalf of American Honda Motor Co, Inc.. (Gilford, Lisa) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Mattson on behalf of American Honda Motor Co, Inc.. (Mattson, Eric) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Troutner on behalf of Gary Samouris, Nida Edith Samson. (Troutner, Melissa) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Lesser on behalf of Gary Samouris, Nida Edith Samson. (Lesser, Natalie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Meltzer on behalf of Gary Samouris, Nida Edith Samson. (Meltzer, Joseph) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA, INC.S FIRST RESPONSIVE PLEADING ( Answer due by 7/19/2019) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen M. Bickerdt on behalf of Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Bickerdt, Carmen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLCS Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint ( Answer due by 7/1/2019) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation (Letzmann, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Letzmann on behalf of ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation. (Letzmann, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert C. Donovan on behalf of ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation. (Donovan, Herbert) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. TRW Automotive US, LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. American Honda Motor Co, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 29, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *TRW Automotive US, LLC* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *American Honda Motor Co, Inc.* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Gary Samouris, Nida Edith Samson re #1 Complaint,, Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7216342 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: San Diego, California - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Shea, David) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary E. Samouris et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Matthew Letzmann
Represented By: Judson D Brown
Represented By: Michael A Glick
Represented By: Matthew T Regan
Represented By: Herbert C Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Represented By: Eric S Mattson
Represented By: George B Donnini
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Carmen M Bickerdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Judson D Brown
Represented By: Michael A Glick
Represented By: Matthew T Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Samouris
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: David J. Shea
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida Edith Samson
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: David J. Shea
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Altier
Represented By: David J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?