Rubio et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings, Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Shields, Laura Shimko, Sigfredo Rubio, Xin Wang, Margaret Rizzo and Jami S Oliver
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and FCA U.S., LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06898
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 32 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Michigan Eastern
August 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Transfer to the Central District of California for MDL 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 MDL Certified Transfer Order to Central District of California for MDL # 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/7/19 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-11295 MAG-EAS from Eastern District of Michigan. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-2905 JAK (FFMx). (esa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Wilcox on behalf of TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Wilcox, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Regan on behalf of TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Regan, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Glick on behalf of TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Glick, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Brown on behalf of TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Brown, Judson) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 MDL Certified Transfer Order for MDL # 2905. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant FCA US LLC to Respond to Class Action Complaint. ( Answer due by 7/27/2019) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Azar, Thomas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Kickham, Edward) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLCS Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint ( Response due by 7/1/2019). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Letzmann, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert C. Donovan on behalf of ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Donovan, Herbert) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Letzmann on behalf of ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Letzmann, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barnett, H.) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Daniel Miles, III on behalf of Jami S Oliver, Margaret Rizzo, Sigfredo Rubio, Andrea Shields, Laura Shimko, Xin Wang. (Miles, W.) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Ferri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ferri, Daniel) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tangren on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tangren, John) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Levitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Levitt, Adam) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory D. Hanley appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hanley, Gregory) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie K. Warrow appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warrow, Jamie) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *American Honda Motor Co., Inc., FCA US LLC, TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7225973 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S.D.C. for the E. D. Michigan, 2:19-cv-11215, Judge Hon. Mark A. Goldsmith] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint) (Kickham, Edward) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubio et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings, Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Judson D Brown
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Matthew T Regan
Represented By: Michael A Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Herbert C Donovan
Represented By: Judson D Brown
Represented By: Matthew Letzmann
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Matthew T Regan
Represented By: Michael A Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA U.S., LLC
Represented By: Thomas L Azar
Represented By: Stephen A D'Aunoy
Represented By: Kathy A Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Shields
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Shimko
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xin Wang
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rizzo
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami S Oliver
Represented By: Gregory D Hanley
Represented By: Edward F Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: H Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: John E Tangren
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: Jamie K Warrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?