Thomas Copley et al v. ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Coyner, Thomas Copley and Elizabeth Evans
Defendant: KIA Motor America, Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp and Hyundai Motor America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv06901
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et)
August 9, 2019 Filing 33 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Washington Western
August 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
August 8, 2019 Filing 34 Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 2:19-ml-02905-JAK (FFMx) regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-00707-RSL from USDC for the Western District of Washington (Seattle). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-02905-JAK (FFMx). (et)
August 8, 2019 Filing 32 MDL #2905 TRANSFER ORDER In Re ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation; transferred to the Central District of California; assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Email re: transfer case) (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Seong H. Kim, in re ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2905 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Response of Defendant Hyundai Mobis Co., LTD. to Motion for Transfer and Coordination of Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, in re ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, MDL. No. 2905 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Attorney Seong H. Kim, in re ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation, MDL. No. 2905 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re Parties' #27 Motion to Amend Case Deadlines: The deadlines related to initial disclosures and submission of the Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan are continued until after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on the motion filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Case Deadlines, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc. Noting Date 6/13/2019, (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jaqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, Gary E. Samouris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, in re ZF-TRW ACU DEFECT LITIGATION, Case Pending No. 35. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Corrected Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #15 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #16 Exhibit 12) (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Responsive Pleading Deadline re parties' #19 Stipulated Motion. Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. shall file an answer, or other responsive pleading on or before 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John H Beisner for defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, and Kia Motor America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew Tako for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, and Kia Motor America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Caroline Van Ness for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, and Kia Motor America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lance A Etcheverry for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, and for Kia Motor America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John H. Beisner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5791776 (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Amend Responsive Pleading Deadline, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc. Noting Date 6/3/2019, (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew Tako FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5791532 (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Caroline Van Ness FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5791514 (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lance A. Etcheverry FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5791504 (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Martin Ledford on behalf of Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc. (Ledford, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER to amend ZF defendants' responsive pleading deadline re parties' #11 Stipulated Motion: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLC shall file an answer, motion, or other responsive pleading on or before 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Amend ZF Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline and (proposed) Order, filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. Noting Date 5/20/2019, (Squires, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ZF North America, Inc. for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp (Squires, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Randolph Squires, III on behalf of Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Squires, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. on 5/16/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans. (McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kia Motor America, Inc. on 5/15/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans. (McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Hyundai Motor America, Inc. on 5/15/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans. (McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp (main document), Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc (Attachments: #1 Hyundai, #2 Kia)(MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, Summons ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. by Plaintiffs Thomas Copley, Marvin Coyner, Elizabeth Evans (Attachments: #1 Summons Kia Motor America, #2 Summons Hyundai Motor America)(McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #2 Summons Issued, : (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE DISREGARD - Issued in Error - Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hyundai Motor America Inc, Kia Motor America Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SNP) Modified on 5/14/2019 (SNP). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5763606) Attorney Ryan McDevitt added to party Thomas Copley(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan McDevitt added to party Marvin Coyner(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan McDevitt added to party Elizabeth Evans(pty:pla), filed by Thomas Copley, Elizabeth Evans, Marvin Coyner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons- Hyundai Motor America, Inc., #3 Summons Summons - Kia Motor America, Inc., #4 Summons ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.)(McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Copley et al v. ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Coyner
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Erika M Keech
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Copley
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Erika M Keech
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Evans
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Erika M Keech
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Motor America, Inc
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Christopher Martin Ledford
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp
Represented By: William R Squires, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Christopher Martin Ledford
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?