Arthur Putt et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Putt and Janet Putt
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Forest River, Inc., Does 1-850 inclusive, Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., The Pep Boys Manny, Moe and Jack of California, SOCO West, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc., General Electric Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, Certain-Teed Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, John Crane Inc., Genuine Parts Company, CBS Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv06909
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (mrgo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND held before Judge Percy Anderson re: #5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to State Court. Case Remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, 18STCV06912. (See document for details). MD JS-6. Case Terminated. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (mrgo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Text Only Entry For the reasons stated on the record, the Court concludes that the Notice of Removal was procedurally defective both because one of the parties properly joined and served as a defendant is a citizen of the State in which such action is brought in violation of 28 U.S.C. section 1441(b)(2) and the removing defendant failed to obtain the consent or joinder of all served defendants or affirmatively explain the absence of those defendants in the Notice of Removal as required by 28 U.S.C. section 1446(a). This action is hereby immediately remanded to the Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 18STCV06912. 28 U.S.C. section 1447(c). A written order will follow.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Schwartz, Jonathan) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Emergency REQUEST to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #5 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alina Mooradian, #2 Exhibit A - Relevant Portions of August 8, 2019 Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - August 6, 2019 Transcript)(Mooradian, Alina)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06909 PA(JCx). (rn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency REQUEST to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Arthur Putt, Janet Putt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah R. Rosenthal, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Alesio, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Deborah R Rosenthal added to party Arthur Putt(pty:pla), Attorney Deborah R Rosenthal added to party Janet Putt(pty:pla)) (Rosenthal, Deborah)
August 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/07/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2)(lh)
August 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CBS Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc., Does, Ford Motor Company, Forest River, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, SOCO West, Inc., The Pep Boys Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Union Carbide Corporation. Filed by Plaintiffs Janet Putt, Arthur Putt. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/03/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Mooradian, Alina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; Evercore Trust Company, N.A.; BlackRock, Inc. and The Vanguard Group. (Mooradian, Alina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mooradian, Alina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 18STCV06912 Receipt No: 0973-24230134 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Declaration of Alina Mooradian, #4 Exhibit A - Transcript, #5 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs's Amended Supp Resp to LASOD Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit C - Form 10-K) (Attorney Alina E Mooradian added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Mooradian, Alina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur Putt et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Putt
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Represented By: Nicholas J Angelides
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Represented By: Brent J Zadorozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Putt
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Represented By: Nicholas J Angelides
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Represented By: Brent J Zadorozny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Alina E Mooradian
Represented By: Warren E Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-850 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys Manny, Moe and Jack of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCO West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?