Crypto Asset Fund, LLC et al v. OPSkins Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Digital Capital Management, LLC and Crypto Asset Fund, LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10, William Quigley, John Brechisci, Jr., Exposition Park Holdings SEZC, Jonathan Yantis, OPSkins Group Inc., Malcolm CasSelle and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06983
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiffs Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, Digital Capital Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Timothy Enneking iso Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to Enneking Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Enneking Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Enneking Declaration, #5 Declaration of Jeffrey N. Goldberg iso Plaintiffs' Opposition, #6 Exhibit 1 to Goldberg Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to Goldberg Declaration, #8 Supplement Evidentiary Objections to CasSelle Declaration)(Goldberg, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney John Bradley Leitch APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Jonathan Yantis, Malcolm CasSelle, designating Caroline A. H. Sayers as local counsel. (hr)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Brian W. Fields APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Jonathan Yantis, Malcolm CasSelle, designating Caroline A. H. Sayers as local counsel. (hr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Bradley Leitch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Malcolm CasSelle, Jonathan Yantis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24519136) filed by Defendants Malcolm CasSelle, Jonathan Yantis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sayers, Caroline)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian W. Fields to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Malcolm CasSelle, Jonathan Yantis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24519030) filed by Defendants Malcolm CasSelle, Jonathan Yantis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sayers, Caroline)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Malcolm CasSelle, Jonathan Yantis, (Sayers, Caroline)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Malcolm CasSelle, Jonathan Yantis. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss or Stay, #2 Declaration of CasSelle ISO Motion to Dismiss or Stay, #3 Exhibit A to CasSelle Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to CasSelle Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to CasSelle Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to CasSelle Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to CasSelle Declaration, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss or Stay) (Attorney Caroline A H Sayers added to party Malcolm CasSelle(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline A H Sayers added to party Jonathan Yantis(pty:dft)) (Sayers, Caroline)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Digital Capital Management, LLC, Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, upon Defendant OPSkins Group Inc. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon officer and/or agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Digital Capital Management, LLC, Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, upon Defendant Exposition Park Holdings SEZC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon officer and/or agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Digital Capital Management, LLC, Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, upon Defendant Malcolm CasSelle served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Digital Capital Management, LLC, Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, upon Defendant Jonathan Yantis served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonathan Yantis in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Answer due 9/27/19 per FRCP 4(e)(1) & CCP 415.40 (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant John Brechisci, Jr., Malcolm CasSelle, Exposition Park Holdings SEZC, OPSkins Group Inc., William Quigley, Jonathan Yantis. (iv)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-00177 CJC(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06983 CJC(JCx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, Digital Capital Management, LLC. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, Digital Capital Management, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-00177-CJC-JC (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Crypto Asset Fund, LLC, Digital Capital Management, LLC. (Goldberg, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24245703 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Digital Capital Management, LLC, Crypto Asset Fund, LLC. (Attorney Jeffrey N Goldberg added to party Crypto Asset Fund, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey N Goldberg added to party Digital Capital Management, LLC(pty:pla))(Goldberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crypto Asset Fund, LLC et al v. OPSkins Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey N Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crypto Asset Fund, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey N Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brechisci, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exposition Park Holdings SEZC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Yantis
Represented By: Caroline A H Sayers
Represented By: J Bradley Leitch
Represented By: Brian Wayne Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPSkins Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm CasSelle
Represented By: Caroline A H Sayers
Represented By: J Bradley Leitch
Represented By: Brian Wayne Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?