Mary-Catherine Boumaiz v. Charter Communications, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Mary-Catherine Boumaiz
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06997
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Standing Order filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Mackay, Aimee)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pg)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on August 13, 2019. (Mackay, Aimee)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
August 12, 2019 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
August 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Charter Communications, LLC, Does, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Mary-Catherine Boumaiz. (Filed in state court 5/23/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC, identifying Charter Communications Operating LLC. (Mackay, Aimee)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Mackay, Aimee)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, San Luis Obispo County, case number 19CV-0310 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 08/12/2019, receipt number 0973-24247309), filed by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aimee Mackay ISO Defendants Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - (Complaint, etc.), #3 Exhibit B - (Answer to Complaint), #4 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Aimee G Mackay added to party Charter Communications, LLC(pty:dft))(Mackay, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary-Catherine Boumaiz v. Charter Communications, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Aimee G Mackay
Represented By: Max C Fischer
Represented By: Anahi Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary-Catherine Boumaiz
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Represented By: Cody R Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?