Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd. v. Master Licensing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.
Defendant: Master Licensing, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07001
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Master Licensing, Inc. answer now due 10/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Master Licensing, Inc..(Attorney David Aaron Grossman added to party Master Licensing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Grossman, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd., upon Defendant Master Licensing, Inc. served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew Garroni, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Anderson, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.. (Anderson, Peter)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Request for summons has the wrong case number. Case opening clerk has placed the correct case number. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Master Licensing, Inc. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd., (Anderson, Peter)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.. (Anderson, Peter)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.. (Anderson, Peter)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24248085 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Peter J Anderson added to party Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.(pty:pla))(Anderson, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd. v. Master Licensing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamrock Entertainment, Ltd.
Represented By: Peter J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Licensing, Inc.
Represented By: David Aaron Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?