Luis Villegas v. Joseph Conzonire et al
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Defendant: Does 1-10, Joseph Conzonire, Marilyn L. Conzonire, Janice Conzonire, Ronald H. Conzonire and C and J Food Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv07011
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants C and J Food Company, Janice Conzonire(in individual), Joseph Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009), Marilyn L. Conzonire(in individual), Ronald H. Conzonire(in individual), (Daugherty, Melissa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants C and J Food Company, Janice Conzonire(in individual), Joseph Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009), Marilyn L. Conzonire(in individual), Ronald H. Conzonire(in individual).(Daugherty, Melissa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ronald H. Conzonire(in individual) answer now due 10/14/2019; Joseph Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009) answer now due 10/30/2019; Ronald H. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002) answer now due 10/14/2019; Joseph Conzonire(in individual ) answer now due 10/30/2019; C and J Food Company answer now due 10/28/2019; Janice Conzonire(in individual) answer now due 10/14/2019; Marilyn L. Conzonire(in individual) answer now due 10/14/2019; Marilyn L. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002) answer now due 10/14/2019; Janice Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009) answer now due 10/14/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Ronald H. Conzonire(in individual); Joseph Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009); Ronald H. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002); Joseph Conzonire(in individual ); C and J Food Company ; Janice Conzonire(in individual); Marilyn L. Conzonire(in individual); Marilyn L. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002); Janice Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009).(Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party C and J Food Company (pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Janice Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Janice Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Joseph Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Joseph Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Marilyn L. Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Marilyn L. Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Ronald H. Conzonire(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa T Daugherty added to party Ronald H. Conzonire(pty:dft))(Daugherty, Melissa)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before September 23, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (iv)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas, re Generic Text Only Entry, 10 served on 09/11/2019. (Carson, Chris)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Marilyn L. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002) served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marilyn L. Conzonire, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Ronald H. Conzonire(in individual) served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ronald H. Conzonire, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Joseph Conzonire(in individual ) served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Janice Conzonire -Wife in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant C and J Food Company served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Janice Conzonire-Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Janice Conzonire(in individual) served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Janice Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009) served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #8 The incorrect document was attached to the docket # 8, the correct document has now been attached. (rn)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07011 FMO(GJSx). (rn) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/15/2019) (rn).
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants C and J Food Company, Janice Conzonire(in individual), Janice Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009), Joseph Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee of the Joseph and Janice Conzonire Trust established March 31, 2009), Joseph Conzonire(in individual ), Marilyn L. Conzonire(in individual), Marilyn L. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002), Ronald H. Conzonire(in individual), Ronald H. Conzonire(representative capacity as trustee under the Conzonire Family Trust dated June 6, 2002). (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24249922 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Luis Villegas(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Villegas v. Joseph Conzonire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Conzonire
Represented By: Melissa T Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn L. Conzonire
Represented By: Melissa T Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Conzonire
Represented By: Melissa T Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald H. Conzonire
Represented By: Melissa T Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C and J Food Company
Represented By: Melissa T Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?