Luis Villegas v. James T. Teshima et al
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Defendant: James T. Teshima, Carls Jr. Restaurants LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07012
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant James T. Teshima(representative capacity as trustee of The James T. Teshima Separate Property Living Trust dated June 19, 2017) served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James T. Teshima, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Carls Jr. Restaurants LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants Carls Jr. Restaurants LLC, Does, James T. Teshima(representative capacity as trustee of The James T. Teshima Separate Property Living Trust dated June 19, 2017), James T. Teshima(in individual ).(Attorney David N Buffington added to party Carls Jr. Restaurants LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David N Buffington added to party James T. Teshima(pty:dft), Attorney David N Buffington added to party James T. Teshima(pty:dft))(Buffington, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (vv)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07012 AB(AGRx). (rn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Carls Jr. Restaurants LLC, James T. Teshima (representative capacity as trustee of The James T. Teshima Separate Property Living Trust dated June 19, 2017), James T. Teshima (in individual ). (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24249958 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Luis Villegas(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Villegas v. James T. Teshima et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Teshima
Represented By: David N Buffington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carls Jr. Restaurants LLC
Represented By: David N Buffington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?