Rakel Tiehand Fleming v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Rakel Tiehand Fleming
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2019cv07029
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Nalty, Sean)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDARPENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Notice of Settlement #14 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Nalty, Sean)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07029 SVW(FFMx). (rn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #11 served on 8/21/19. (Nalty, Sean)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Nalty, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Notice to Adverse Party and Clerk of the Los Angeles County Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action served on 8/13/19. (Nalty, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 8/14/19. (Nalty, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/16/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 13, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Filed by Plaintiff Rakel Tiehand Fleming. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, COMPTON COURTHOUSE ON 7/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 8/13/2019. (Nalty, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, identifying Sun Life Financial Inc.. (Nalty, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Nalty, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Small Claims Division, case number 19CMSC01637 Receipt No: 0973-24252770 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attorney Sean P Nalty added to party Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada(pty:dft))(Nalty, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rakel Tiehand Fleming v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakel Tiehand Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?