Carol Ann Finston v. Nancy Berryhill
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Finston
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv07040
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7040 SP on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Carol Ann Finston, served on September 24, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipts)(Gilinger, Lisa)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy Berryhill. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Nancy Berryhill(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHERI PYM [SOCIAL SECURITY]: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM SIMILAR ORDERS BY OTHER JUDGES: Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint and a copy of this order on defendant in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants counsel shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint. Defendant shall electronically serve on plaintiff a complete copy of the administrative record within 90 days of the service of the complaint (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Carol Ann Finston. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (sbou)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kca)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Real Party In Interest Defendant Carol Ann Finston. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Carol Ann Finston. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carol Ann Finston. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carol Ann Finston, identifying None. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Carol Ann Finston. (Attorney Lisa C Gilinger added to party Carol Ann Finston(pty:rpid))(Gilinger, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carol Ann Finston v. Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Finston
Represented By: Lisa C Gilinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?