United States of America v. Approximately 518,172.92 USD in Bank Funds Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 4455
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately 518,172.92 USD in Bank Funds Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 4485
Case Number: 2:2019cv07048
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 8/19/19 and 8/20/19 upon Defendant Approximately 518,172.92 USD in Bank Funds Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 4485 last date of publication 9/17/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Publication was made in the in the official government website www.forfeiture.gov. (Kucera, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-06742 RGK(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07048 RGK(PJWx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (rn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kucera, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of Approximately $518,172.92 in Bank Funds Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account '4455 issued on Complaint #1 . (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kucera, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICE MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kucera, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 8/13/19, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Kucera, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kucera, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney John Kucera added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Kucera, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately 518,172.92 USD in Bank Funds Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 4455
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 518,172.92 USD in Bank Funds Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account 4485
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Kucera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?