Packaging Corporation of America v. Bonert s Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Packaging Corporation of America
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Bonert's Jadasaha, LLC, BEEFAM, LLC, BONERT'S MIBON, LLC, Bonert Management Company, Inc., Bonert's Inc. d/b/a Bonert's Slice of Pie, Vivien Bonert, 3144 Bonert's, LLC, Bonert's MV, LLC, Michael Bonert, 3144 Bonert s, LLC, Bonert s MV, LLC, Bonert s Jadasaha, LLC, Bonert s Mibon, LLC and Bonert s Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07058
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: James V Selna
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Removal of Civil Action to United States Bankruptcy Court filed by Defendants Michael Bonert, Vivien Bonert. (Forsley, Alan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America, upon Defendant 3144 Bonert s, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Beefam, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Michael Bonert served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Vivien Bonert served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Bonert Management Company, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Bonert s Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Bonert s Jadasaha, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Bonert s MV, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; Bonert s Mibon, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marc Lieberman, attorney for the Defendants in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - counsel emails)(Lowe, Sean)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 10/14/2019. (lb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:16-cv-00818 JVS(KSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07058 JVS(KSx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bonert s Mibon, LLC. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bonert s MV, LLC. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bonert s Jadasaha, LLC. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bonert s Inc. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bonert Management Company, Inc. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Vivien Bonert. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Michael Bonert. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Beefam, LLC. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant 3144 Bonert s, LLC. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America, (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Errata to the Complaint filed by plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - statement of account, #2 Exhibit 2 - judgment)(Lowe, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24256570 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America. (Attorney Sean J Lowe added to party Packaging Corporation of America(pty:pla))(Lowe, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Packaging Corporation of America v. Bonert s Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert's Jadasaha, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEEFAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONERT'S MIBON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert Management Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert's Inc. d/b/a Bonert's Slice of Pie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivien Bonert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3144 Bonert's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert's MV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bonert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3144 Bonert s, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert s MV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert s Jadasaha, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert s Mibon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonert s Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Packaging Corporation of America
Represented By: Sean J Lowe
Represented By: David Michael Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?