Rui Zhang v. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Plaintiff: Mr. Rui Zhang and Rui Zhang
Defendant: Acting Dir. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 2:2019cv07064
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #12 , Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, as the Acting Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, has up to and including 1/24/2020 to respond to the Complaint for Declaratory Relief. (gk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Order For Extension of time to respond to complaint for declaratory relief filed by Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Marcus M Kerner added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft))(Kerner, Marcus)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rui Zhang, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Huang, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, as the Acting Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (gk)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 filed by plaintiff Rui Zhang. (Huang, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 4 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rui Zhang v. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Dir. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Marcus M Kerner
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Rui Zhang
Represented By: Daniel T Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rui Zhang
Represented By: Daniel T Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?