Keith Berman v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Keith Berman
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv07079
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7079 JPR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Keith Berman. (Samulon, Eliot)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Keith Berman, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/27/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. VELOZ. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Samulon, Eliot)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Plaintiff must electronically file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order or as soon as service is timely completed. (See document for details.) (sbou)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (et)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eliot R Samulon counsel for Plaintiff Keith Berman. Adding ELIOT R SAMULON as counsel of record for KEITH BERMAN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF KEITH BERMAN. (Attorney Eliot R Samulon added to party Keith Berman(pty:pla))(Samulon, Eliot)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua W Potter counsel for Plaintiff Keith Berman. JOSHUA W. POTTER is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF KEITH BERMAN. (Potter, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF Keith Berman. (Potter, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Keith Berman, identifying KEITH BERMAN AND COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Potter, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Keith Berman. (Potter, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Keith Berman. (Potter, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF Keith Berman. (Attorney Joshua W Potter added to party Keith Berman(pty:pla))(Potter, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith Berman v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Berman
Represented By: Eliot R Samulon
Represented By: Joshua W Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?