Harold Pick v. James A. Kay, et al
Plaintiff: Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC and Jay Francis
Defendant: Motorola Solutions, Inc., James A. Kay, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Lucky s Two-Way Radios, Inc. and Peter E. Carlson
Case Number: 2:2019cv07137
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, Jay Francis, Wireless US, LC, upon Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lesches, Levi)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendants Motorola Solutions, Inc., James A. Kay, Lucky's Two-Way Radios, Inc., Peter E. Carlson. (gk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jay Francis, Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC. (Lesches, Levi)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was found: Summons request made as to defendants lists James A. Kay, Jr. to be served on Attachment No. 2. The First Amended Complaint names defendant as James A. Kay. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jay Francis, Harold Pick, Wireless US, LC. (Lesches, Levi)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Wireless US, LC, Peter E. Carlson, Jay Francis amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick(Lesches, Levi)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 9/13/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-7137-DMG (FFMx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07137 DMG(FFMx). (rn)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:04-cv-02655 JFW(Ex) (rn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. (shb)
August 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, identifying Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi)
August 18, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24273283 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Levi Lesches added to party Harold Pick(pty:pla))(Lesches, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harold Pick v. James A. Kay, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky s Two-Way Radios, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter E. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Pick
Represented By: Levi Lesches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wireless US, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?