Scott Meide et al v. Noah Centineo et al
Plaintiff: Merlyn Hegland, Dawn Hegland, Kyle A. Janes, Scott Meide, David Hegland and Nathan Hill
Defendant: Robert Centineo, Brandon Kramer, Steve Tejeda, Sheldon Rabinowitz, Rene A. Torres, Alpine Pictures, Inc., Greg Kramer, Marc J. Lane, Jeff Urdank, Summertime Entertainment, Aviron Capital, LLC, Addison Textor, Ryan Carroll, Brad Jashinsky, Wayne Kramer, David Sugarman, Stereo Vision Entertainment, Inc., Noah Centineo, Roland Carroll, Agnes King, Michael K. Douglas, Frank Patterson, Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc., John Textor, Dana Tejeda, The Velardi Group, LLC, Kellee Andes Centineo, Others Unknown, Kevin Trudeau, John A. King, Neil L. Kaufman, William Sadleir, John M. Gatti, Esq., Claire Heath, CW3PR, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Bonnie Radford, Natalie J. King, O'Melveny Law Firm, Svetlana Carroll, Greg Centineo, Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Michael E. Wilford, CPA, Peter Velardi, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, John Jack Honour, Nick Centineo, Laura Anthony, Esq., Charlie C. Walters, James E. Roberts, Julie C. Natale, Anthony LG, PLLC, Joy Kramer, Christie Hsiao, Tara K. Glaser, Chris McGarahan, Robert Laimo, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Deborah Textor, Judi Becker, Rich Carroll and Legal and Compliance, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07171
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Deborah Textor, identifying JohnTextor, Deborah Textor, Addision Textor, Pulse Evolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Arouh, Kimberly)
October 25, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant John Textor filed by defendant John Textor. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Arouh, Kimberly)
October 25, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Deborah Textor and Defendant Addision Textor filed by defendant Deborah Textor. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Arouh, Kimberly)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 currently set for hearing on November 4, 2019 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 23, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chrystal L Ferber on behalf of Defendants Anthony LG, PLLC, Laura Anthony, Esq. (Ferber, Chrystal)
October 23, 2019 Filing 109 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs David Hegland, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, Kyle A. Janes, Scott Meideto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #95 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in re STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS (Meide, Scott)
October 22, 2019 Filing 108 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Frank Patterson, identifying Frank Patterson. (McPherson, Edwin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Frank Patterson. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FRANK PATTERSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6), #2 Exhibit 1 - ORDER, #3 Proposed Order GRANTING FRANK PATTERSONS MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6)) (McPherson, Edwin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 106 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Hegland, Scott Meide, Kyle A. Janes, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill. upon Merlyn Hegland waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019; Addison Textor waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019; Deborah Textor waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019; John Textor waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard Salazar, esq.. (Meide, Scott)
October 22, 2019 Filing 105 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) 8(a), and 9(b) #65 filed by Plaintiffs David Hegland, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, Scott Meide. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meide, Scott)
October 21, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Anthony LG, PLLC, Laura Anthony, Esq.. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David C Gurnick added to party Anthony LG, PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney David C Gurnick added to party Laura Anthony, Esq.(pty:dft)) (Gurnick, David)
October 18, 2019 Filing 103 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kevin Trudeau, (Bongco, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Kevin Trudeau, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #101 served on 10/18/2019. (Bongco, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Kevin Trudeau. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bongco, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 100 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 with certificate of service filed by Defendants Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Michael E. Wilford, CPA. (Green, Vincent)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Dismiss Case #45 currently set for hearing on October 28, 2019 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #91 Non-Resident Attorney Robert A. McNeely APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Frank Patterson, designating Edwin F. McPherson as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Dismiss #11 ; MOTION to Dismiss #12 ; MOTION to Dismiss #13 ; MOTION to Dismiss #38 currently set for hearing on October 21, 2019, are hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2019 Filing 91 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert A. McNeely to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Frank Patterson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24620615) filed by Defendant Frank Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Attorney Edwin F McPherson added to party Frank Patterson(pty:dft)) (McPherson, Edwin)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court hereby orders Plaintiff Scott Meide to show cause in writing why his securities fraud claim against all named defendants is not time-barred under the statute of limitations governing Section 10(b) claims. Plaintiff's response to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed no later than October 30, 2019. Failure to adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause by October 30, 2019, may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff Scott Meide's claims without further warning. (Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2019.) (mrgo)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND CONTINUE THE MOTION DAY ON THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE, AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson re: #78 EX PARTE APPLICATION. (mrgo)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JOHN M. GATTI, ESQ.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY 14 DAYS by Judge Percy Anderson re: #79 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer. John M. Gatti, Esq. answer due 10/29/2019. (mrgo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/29/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 #79 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #83 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #80 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #82 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #81 served on 10/15/2019. (Barrow, Amanda)
October 14, 2019 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq., identifying Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP. (Klein, Corey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 82 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Dane Barrow counsel for Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. Adding Amanda Dane Barrow as counsel of record for Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. (Attorney Amanda Dane Barrow added to party John M. Gatti, Esq.(pty:dft))(Barrow, Amanda)
October 14, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan Jay Weil counsel for Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. Adding Alan Jay Weil as counsel of record for Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. (Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party John M. Gatti, Esq.(pty:dft))(Weil, Alan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Corey E Klein counsel for Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. Adding Corey E. Klein as counsel of record for Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. (Klein, Corey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 79 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/29/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corey E. Klein in Support of Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.'s Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by 14 Days, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Corey E. Klein, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Corey E. Klein, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant John M. Gatti, Esq.'s Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by 14 Days) (Attorney Corey E Klein added to party John M. Gatti, Esq.(pty:dft)) (Klein, Corey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 78 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File and Amended Notice of Motion and Continue the Motion Day on their Motion to Dismiss, Strike and for a More Definite Statement with certificate of service filed by Defendants Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Michael E. Wilford, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Vincent Green, #3 Proposed Motion, #4 Proposed Order) (Green, Vincent)
October 14, 2019 Filing 77 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard Martin Foster counsel for Defendant Sheldon Rabinowitz. Adding David R. Euredjian as counsel of record for Sheldon Rabinowitz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sheldon Rabinowitz. (Foster, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(6) #45 filed by Defendant O'Melveny Law Firm. (Yoder, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Attorney Greg Centineo, Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Agnes King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC, Peter Velardi, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Proof of Service and Amended Notice of Interested Parties #73 served on October 11, 2019. (Moody, Maureen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Proof of Service and Amended Notice of Interested Parties filed by Attorney Greg Centineo, Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Agnes King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC, Peter Velardi. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave) (Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Kellee Andes Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Nick Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Noah Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Robert Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party John A. King(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Agnes King (pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Greg Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Joy Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Wayne Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party Chris McGarahan(pty:dft), Attorney Maureen J Moody added to party James E. Roberts(pty:dft)) (Moody, Maureen)
October 10, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Amendment (Motion related) #68 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by. (yl)
October 10, 2019 Filing 71 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc., identifying Hyde Park Entertainment Inc.. (Wahl, Joseph)
October 10, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hyde Park Entertainment Inc. filed by Defendant Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Joseph M Wahl added to party Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Wahl, Joseph)
October 10, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amendment (Motion related) #68 . The following error(s) was/were found: Leave of court required for filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Leave of court is required for re-noticing of motion.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 9, 2019 Filing 68 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #72 ** Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 with certificate of service filed by Defendants Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Michael E. Wilford, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Green, Vincent) Modified on 10/11/2019 (yl).
October 8, 2019 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO HEATH AND BECKER'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff Scott Meide. (yl)
October 7, 2019 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Greg Centineo, Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Agnes King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC, Peter Velardi, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) 8(a), and 9(b) #65 served on October 7, 2019. (Shenian, Datev Dave)
October 7, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) 8(a), and 9(b) filed by Defendants Greg Centineo, Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Agnes King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC, Peter Velardi. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order ISO Motion to Dismiss) (Shenian, Datev Dave)
October 7, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-24569715 for $400 filing fee. (Foster, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Sheldon Rabinowitz. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Richard Martin Foster added to party Sheldon Rabinowitz(pty:dft)) (Foster, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant O'Melveny Law Firm, (Massey, Ashton)
October 7, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendants Judi Becker, Claire Heath. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shumener, Betty)
October 7, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendants Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, William Sadleir. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shumener, Betty)
October 7, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC #13 filed by Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shumener, Betty)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson re: #53 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to the date on which this Order is entered. (mrgo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #54 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/4/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 #53 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Case number listed on documents CV 1907171CAS(KSX); Correct case number is CV 1907171PA (KSx). Counsel are ordered to use the correct case number in any future filings. (mrgo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(6) #45 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel are ordered to file a Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (twdb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #54 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/4/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 #53 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case number listed as CV 19-07171-CAS(KSX); Correct case number is CV 19-07171-PA (KS). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (kss)
October 4, 2019 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Noah Centineo, identifying The Velardi Group, LLC. (Shenian, Datev Dave)
October 4, 2019 Filing 53 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/4/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Noah Centineo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shenian, Datev Dave)
October 4, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(6) #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 4, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No hearing set on calendar; no [Prop] Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: DENYING #47 Non-Resident Attorney Richard Salazar APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Textor, Deborah Textor and Addison Textor. (lom)
October 2, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richrd Salazar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Addison Textor, Deborah Textor, John Textor (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24540946) #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #44 by Judge Percy Anderson. (lom)
October 2, 2019 Filing 47 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richrd Salazar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Addison Textor, Deborah Textor, John Textor (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24540946) filed by Defendant Addison Textor, Deborah Textor, John Textor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kimberly Arouh added to party Addison Textor(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Arouh added to party Deborah Textor(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Arouh added to party John Textor(pty:dft)) (Arouh, Kimberly)
September 30, 2019 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Hegland, Scott Meide, Kyle A. Janes, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, upon Defendant Aviron Capital, LLC served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Aviron Pictures, LLC served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Judi Becker served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; John M. Gatti, Esq. served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Louis N. Hamel, CPA served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Claire Heath served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Greg Kramer served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; Joy Kramer served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019; O'Melveny Law Firm served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; William Sadleir served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; Michael E. Wilford, CPA served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo)
September 30, 2019 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs David Hegland, Scott Meide, Kyle A. Janes, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, upon defendant Sheldon Rabinowitz served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sheldon B. Rabinowitz in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney Kimball R Anderson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kevin Trudeau, designating Justin M Bongco as local counsel. (lom)
September 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(6) filed by Defendant O'Melveny Law Firm. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael G Yoder added to party O'Melveny Law Firm(pty:dft)) (Yoder, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Greg Kramer answer now due 10/4/2019; Noah Centineo answer now due 10/4/2019; Kellee Andes Centineo answer now due 10/4/2019; Peter Velardi answer now due 10/4/2019; Brandon Kramer answer now due 10/4/2019; Marc J. Lane answer now due 10/4/2019; Joy Kramer answer now due 10/4/2019; Robert Centineo answer now due 10/4/2019; Tara K. Glaser answer now due 10/4/2019; The Velardi Group, LLC answer now due 10/4/2019; Agnes King answer now due 10/4/2019; Robert Laimo answer now due 10/4/2019; Wayne Kramer answer now due 10/4/2019; Nick Centineo answer now due 10/4/2019; Chris McGarahan answer now due 10/4/2019; James E. Roberts answer now due 10/4/2019; Natalie J. King answer now due 10/4/2019; John A. King answer now due 10/4/2019; Greg Centineo answer now due 10/4/2019; Julie C. Natale answer now due 10/4/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Greg Kramer; Noah Centineo; Kellee Andes Centineo; Peter Velardi; Brandon Kramer; Marc J. Lane; Joy Kramer; Robert Centineo; Tara K. Glaser ; The Velardi Group, LLC; Agnes King ; Robert Laimo; Wayne Kramer; Nick Centineo; Chris McGarahan; James E. Roberts; Natalie J. King; John A. King; Greg Centineo; Julie C. Natale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Agreed Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Agreed Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 30, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian counsel for Defendants Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, John A. King, Agnes King, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Chris McGarahan, James E. Roberts. Adding Datev 'Dave' Shenian as counsel of record for Kellee Centineo, Nicholas J. Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert J. Centineo, Agnes M. King, John A. King, Gregory W. Kramer, Joy M. Kramer, Wayne D. Kramer, Christopher J. McGarahan, James E. Roberts, Jr for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kellee Centineo, Nicholas J. Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert J. Centineo, Agnes M. King, John A. King, Gregory W. Kramer, Joy M. Kramer, Wayne D. Kramer, Christopher J. McGarahan, James E. Roberts, Jr. (Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 30, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian counsel for Defendants Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, John A. King, Agnes King, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Chris McGarahan, James E. Roberts. Adding Giel Stein as counsel of record for Kellee Centineo, Nicholas J. Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert J. Centineo, Agnes M. King, John A. King, Gregory W. Kramer, Joy M. Kramer, Wayne D. Kramer, Christopher J. McGarahan, James E. Roberts, Jr for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kellee Centineo, Nicholas J. Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert J. Centineo, Agnes M. King, John A. King, Gregory W. Kramer, Joy M. Kramer, Wayne D. Kramer, Christopher J. McGarahan, James E. Roberts, Jr. (Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 30, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian counsel for Defendants Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, John A. King, Agnes King, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Chris McGarahan, James E. Roberts. Adding Maureen J. Moody as counsel of record for Kellee Centineo, Nicholas J. Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert J. Centineo, Agnes M. King, John A. King, Gregory W. Kramer, Joy M. Kramer, Wayne D. Kramer, Christopher J. McGarahan, James E. Roberts, Jr for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kellee Centineo, Nicholas J. Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert J. Centineo, Agnes M. King, John A. King, Gregory W. Kramer, Joy M. Kramer, Wayne D. Kramer, Christopher J. McGarahan, James E. Roberts, Jr. (Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Kellee Andes Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Nick Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Noah Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Robert Centineo(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party John A. King(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Agnes King (pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Greg Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Joy Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Wayne Kramer(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Chris McGarahan(pty:dft), Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party James E. Roberts(pty:dft))(Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 30, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Michael E. Wilford, CPA, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #39 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #38 served on 9/30/2019. (Green, Vincent)
September 30, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Michael E. Wilford, CPA, (Green, Vincent)
September 30, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Michael E. Wilford, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendants Louis N. Hamel, CPA and Michael E. Wilford, CPA's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of their Motion Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Proc. 12(B)(1), (B)(6), 12(E) and Rule 12(F)) (Attorney Vincent S Green added to party Louis N. Hamel, CPA(pty:dft), Attorney Vincent S Green added to party Michael E. Wilford, CPA(pty:dft)) (Green, Vincent)
September 27, 2019 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kimball R. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24520358) filed by Defendant Kevin Trudeau. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bongco, Justin)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Maureen J Moody APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Gregory V. Centineo, Brandon Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Julie C. Natale, Tara K. Glaser, Natalie J. King, Peter Verlardi, The Verlardi Group, LLC, designating Datev Shenian as local counsel. (bm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maureen J. Moody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greg Centineo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24502106) filed by Defendant Greg Centineo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 21 DAYS by Judge Percy Anderson granting #29 EX PARTE APPLICATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Ex Parte Application is GRANTED. 2. The time for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to respond to the initial complaint in this action is extended from September 27, 2019, to and including October 18, 2019. (bm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Dawn Hegland. (mrgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Merlyn Hegland. (mrgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff David Hegland. (mrgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Kevin Trudeau. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin Bongco, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Justin M Bongco added to party Kevin Trudeau(pty:dft)) (Bongco, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Kyle A. Janes. (mrgo)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Giel Stein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Gregory Centineo, Brandon Kramer, Rober Laimo, Marc Lane, Julie Natale, Tara Glaser, Natalie King, Peter Verlardi, and The Verlardi Group LLC, designating David Shenian as local counsel. (mrgo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Giel Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greg Centineo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24470825) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: [Prop] Order was not attached as a separate attachment. (lom)
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Giel Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greg Centineo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24470825) filed by Defendant Greg Centineo. (Attorney Datev Dave Krikor Shenian added to party Greg Centineo(pty:dft)) (Shenian, Datev Dave)
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Hegland, Kyle A. Janes, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, upon Defendant Greg Kramer served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Joy Kramer served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Marc J. Lane served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; James E. Roberts served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Kevin Trudeau served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019, in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Scott Meide to this court's order to show cause with memorandum of law #9 . (twdb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Nathan Hill. (sbou)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC #13 Amended Notice filed by Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Spurling, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 Amended Notice filed by Defendants Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, William Sadleir. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Spurling, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John D Spurling counsel for Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Claire Heath, William Sadleir. Adding John D. Spurling as counsel of record for Aviron Capital, LLC; Aviron Pictures, LLC: Clarius Capital Group, LLC; Clarius Entertainment, LLC; Clarius Releasing, LLC; Claire Heath; Judi Becker; and William Sadleir for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC; Aviron Pictures, LLC; Clarius Capital Group, LLC; Clarius Entertainment, LLC; Clarius Releasing, LLC; Claire Heath; Judi Becker and William Sadleir. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney John D Spurling added to party Aviron Capital, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party Aviron Pictures, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party Judi Becker(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party Clarius Capital Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party Clarius Entertainment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party Clarius Releasing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party Claire Heath(pty:dft), Attorney John D Spurling added to party William Sadleir(pty:dft))(Spurling, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks counsel for Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Claire Heath, William Sadleir. Adding Benjamin Leventhal Hicks as counsel of record for Aviron Capital, LLC; Aviron Pictures, LLC; Clarius Capital Group, LLC; Clarius Entertainment, LLC; Clarius Releasing, LLC; Claire Heath; Judi Becker; and William Sadleir for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC; Aviron Pictures, LLC; Clarius Capital Group, LLC; Clarius Entertainment, LLC; Clarius Releasing, LLC; Claire Heath; Judi Becker and William Sadleir. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Aviron Capital, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Aviron Pictures, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Judi Becker(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Clarius Capital Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Clarius Entertainment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Clarius Releasing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Claire Heath(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party William Sadleir(pty:dft))(Hicks, Benjamin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Claire Heath, William Sadleir, identifying Aviron Pictures, LLC; Aviron Capital, LLC; Clarius Entertainment, LLC; Clarius Releasing, LLC; Clarius Capital Group, LLC; William Sadleir; Judi Becker and Claire Heath. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shumener, Betty)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC filed by Defendants Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Aviron Capital, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Aviron Pictures, LLC(pty:dft)) (Shumener, Betty)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, William Sadleir. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Clarius Capital Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Clarius Entertainment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Clarius Releasing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party William Sadleir(pty:dft)) (Shumener, Betty)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Judi Becker, Claire Heath. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Judi Becker(pty:dft), Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Claire Heath(pty:dft)) (Shumener, Betty)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.3 filed by plaintiff Scott Meide. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff Scott Meide. Re: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #19 (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE with MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Plaintiff Scott Meideto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive #9 (bm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.3 filed by plaintiff Scott Meide. (mrgo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Scott Meide. (mrgo)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2019. (twdb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07171 PA(KSx). (rn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Alpine Pictures, Inc., Anthony LG, PLLC, Laura Anthony, Esq., Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, CW3PR, LLC, Rich Carroll, Roland Carroll, Ryan Carroll, Svetlana Carroll, Greg Centineo, Kellee Andes Centineo, Nick Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Michael K. Douglas, John M. Gatti, Esq., Tara K. Glaser, Louis N. Hamel, CPA, Claire Heath, John Jack Honour, Christie Hsiao, Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc., Brad Jashinsky, Neil L. Kaufman, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Agnes King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, O'Melveny Law Firm, Others Unknown, Frank Patterson, Sheldon Rabinowitz, Bonnie Radford, James E. Roberts, William Sadleir, Stereo Vision Entertainment, Inc., David Sugarman, Summertime Entertainment, Dana Tejeda, Steve Tejeda, Addison Textor, Deborah Textor, John Textor, The Velardi Group, LLC, Rene A. Torres, Kevin Trudeau, Jeff Urdank, Peter Velardi, Charlie C. Walters, Michael E. Wilford, CPA. (jtil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scott Meide. (jtil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs David Hegland, Scott Meide, Kyle A. Janes, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland and Nathan Hill against ALL Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Filing fee $ 400 Paid). (Attachments: #1 CV71 (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Meide et al v. Noah Centineo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Centineo
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Kramer
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Tejeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Rabinowitz
Represented By: Richard Martin Foster
Represented By: David R Euredjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene A. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Pictures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kramer
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc J. Lane
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Urdank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summertime Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviron Capital, LLC
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Textor
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh
Represented By: Richard G Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Jashinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Kramer
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stereo Vision Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Centineo
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agnes King
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Patterson
Represented By: Edwin F McPherson
Represented By: Pierre B Pine
Represented By: Robert A McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Textor
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh
Represented By: Richard G Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Tejeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Velardi Group, LLC
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellee Andes Centineo
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Others Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Trudeau
Represented By: Justin M Bongco
Represented By: Kimball R Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. King
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil L. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sadleir
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Gatti, Esq.
Represented By: Corey E Klein
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil
Represented By: Amanda Dane Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Heath
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CW3PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviron Pictures, LLC
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie J. King
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Melveny Law Firm
Represented By: Ashton Taylor-Misha Massey
Represented By: Michael G Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svetlana Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Centineo
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis N. Hamel, CPA
Represented By: Barry Z Brodsky
Represented By: Vincent S Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarius Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Wilford, CPA
Represented By: Barry Z Brodsky
Represented By: Vincent S Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Velardi
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarius Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jack Honour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Centineo
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Anthony, Esq.
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Represented By: Chrystal L Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie C. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Roberts
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie C. Natale
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony LG, PLLC
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Represented By: Chrystal L Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Kramer
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara K. Glaser
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McGarahan
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Laimo
Represented By: Datev Dave Krikor Shenian
Represented By: Giel Stein
Represented By: Maureen J Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarius Releasing, LLC
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Textor
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh
Represented By: Richard G Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judi Becker
Represented By: John D Spurling
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Represented By: Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal and Compliance, LLC
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Represented By: Chrystal L Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlyn Hegland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Hegland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle A. Janes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Meide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hegland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?