Mack West, Jr. v. Psychologist D. Livesay et al
Plaintiff: Mack West, Jr
Defendant: Psychologist D. Livesay, Correctional Officer Yslas and Correctional Officer Garica
Case Number: 2:2019cv07190
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Extension Request (Dkt. #7 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to submit his prison trust account information is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit his prison trust account information to the Court on or before November 6, 2019. (et)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE REQUEST for an 30 day extension of time to file prison trust account filed by Plaintiff Mack West, Jr. (et)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Mack West, Jr. (sbou)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: DENYING #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.; DENYING #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby : DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application to this Court no later than Friday, October 4, 2019. (shb)
August 27, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 #2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(jdo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiff Mack West, Jr. (lh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiff Mack West, Jr. (lh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Garica, D. Livesay(official capacity), D. Livesay(individual), Yslas pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Filed by Plaintiff Mack West, Jr. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack West, Jr. v. Psychologist D. Livesay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psychologist D. Livesay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Yslas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Garica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack West, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?