Warren Davis v. Covello
Petitioner: Warren Davis
Respondent: Covello
Case Number: 2:2019cv07249
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111, #2 CV-38) (lh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Western Division*.*350 W 1st Street, Suite 4311**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565* Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/21/2019) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Covello, filed by Warren Davis.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1487-GPC-BGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren Davis v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Covello
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?