Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding LLC v. JL Concepts Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding LLC
Defendant: JL Concepts Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07328
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant JL Concepts Inc... (Chiao, Ching)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JL Concepts Inc., (Chiao, Ching)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/6/2019. (ake)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant JL Concepts Inc..(Attorney Ching K Chiao added to party JL Concepts Inc.(pty:dft))(Chiao, Ching)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07328 JAK(JPRx). (rn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding LLC, upon Defendant JL Concepts Inc. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura L. Chung Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chen, Alexander)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding LLC. (Chen, Alexander)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant JL Concepts Inc. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding, identifying None. (Chen, Alexander)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding. (Chen, Alexander)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding. (Chen, Alexander)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24314010 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Attorney Alexander Chen added to party Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding(pty:pla))(Chen, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding LLC v. JL Concepts Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL Concepts Inc.
Represented By: Ching K Chiao
Represented By: Sandy T Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Eyes Traffic Industry USA Holding LLC
Represented By: Alexander Chen
Represented By: Theodore Scott Lee
Represented By: William R Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?