Mike Bulaon et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Devon Lapier, John Andrade, Laura Huizar, Rafael Ceja, Richard Dyer, Willis Hayes, Orlando Ibarra, Holly Ellis, Erasmo Garcia, Raed Ari, David Bell, Nick Brannon, Dan Breckenridge, Frank Marshall, Mark Doty, Solomon Aleka, Martin Mahmoudi, Daniel Braun, Jose Huizar, Jim Gill, Linda Hayes, Patricia Belk, Marcos Cobian, Luis Lopez, Frank Belk, Chad Hughes, Francisco Delacruz, Kyle Krall, Scott Kidd, Calvin Ciapponi, Thaddeus Dykier, Mark Bunker, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Brent Lehr, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Alfonso Hernandez, Casey Dean, Dale Hale, Amos Gates, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Ron Lake, David Fee, Elaine Marshall, Larry Capatosto, Robert Ellington, Linda Brubaker, Franklin Kempner, Jon Aleka, Andy Fok, Michael Hosford, Victor Davis, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mauro Lopez, Jose Acevedo, Janine Lehr, Dudley Baker, Ruben Hurtado, Dan Klatt, Bill Brubaker, Stanley Bronstrup, Jerry Kenny, Dustin Coyner, Kip Holbrook, Michael Blankenship, Ryan Berry, Robert Garitano, Robert Brenier, Mike Lapier, Gerando Barron, Meridith Holloway, Mayra Hernandez, Darrell Anderson, Matt Manna, Daniel Duffy, Alex Llamas, Kevin Harms, Jon Barnhart, Idovino Artifon, Billy Duckworth and Mike Bulaon
Defendant: General Motors LLC, Courtesy Chevrolet Center, Paradise Chevrolet, Robert Bosch GmbH and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07343
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 44 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 11/06/2019 to Jelani Solper for payment made on 08/29/2019 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24353985) #25 #42 . (rdj)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #31 ; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #30 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Transfer Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. The Remand Motion remains pending, to be determined by the Eastern District of Michigan. (iv)
October 8, 2019 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24353985) #25 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee)
October 7, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTES OF MOTION TO REMAND TO CALIFORNIA STATE COURT #30 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF MICHIGAN #31 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
October 7, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant General Motors LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Anya Martin at anya.martin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Smith, Renee)
October 4, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan M Sandrock counsel for Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. Adding Ryan Sandrock as counsel of record for Robert Bosch LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Attorney Ryan M Sandrock added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Sandrock, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Decision: Notice of Recent Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice)(Miller, Charles)
September 23, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY Reply in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #31 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 2019-09-04 Email from C. Miller to M. Slater)(Smith, Renee)
September 23, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #30 filed by Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.. (Miller, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #30 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee)
September 16, 2019 Filing 34 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #31 filed by Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.. (Pearson, Eric)
September 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration R. Smith Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, First Amended Complaint in In re Duramax, #3 Exhibit B, Complaint in Abney v. General Motors LLC, #4 Exhibit C, 2019-08-29 Email from E. Pearson, #5 Proposed Order) (Smith, Renee)
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand) (Miller, Charles)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Smith, Renee D. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of General Motors LLC, designating Robyn E. Bladow as local counsel. (yl)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Pearson, Eric D. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of All Plaintiffs, designating Edward E. Angwin as local counsel. (yl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24353985) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [8, 19] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that General Motors LLCs and the other served Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended by 30 days until September 30, 2019, or to a date 30 days after the Court rules on Defendant General Motors LLCs anticipated motion to transfer. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for further details)granting #8 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer Courtesy Chevrolet Center answer due 9/30/2019; General Motors LLC answer due 9/30/2019; Paradise Chevrolet answer due 9/30/2019; Robert Bosch GmbH answer due 9/30/2019; Robert Bosch LLC answer due 9/30/2019. (yl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric D. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24347030) filed by Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Angwin, Edward)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward Eugene Angwin on behalf of Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Richard Dyer, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huizar, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc. (Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jose Acevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jon Aleka(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Solomon Aleka(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Tim Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Darrell Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party John Andrade(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Raed Ari(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Idovino Artifon(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party James Aukes(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dudley Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jon Barnhart(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Gerando Barron(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Frank Belk(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Patricia Belk(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party David Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Ryan Berry(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Michael Blankenship(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Nick Brannon(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Daniel Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dan Breckenridge(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robert Brenier(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Stanley Bronstrup(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Bill Brubaker(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Linda Brubaker(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mike Bulaon(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mark Bunker(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Larry Capatosto(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Rafael Ceja(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Calvin Ciapponi(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Marcos Cobian(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dustin Coyner(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Edward Curley(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Victor Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Casey Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Francisco Delacruz(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mark Doty(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Billy Duckworth(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Daniel Duffy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Richard Dyer(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Thaddeus Dykier(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Cole Einhaus(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robert Ellington(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Holly Ellis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party David Fee(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Andy Fok(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Erasmo Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robert Garitano(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Amos Gates(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jim Gill(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party David Graham(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mike Gurtovoy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dale Hale(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Kevin Harms(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Linda Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Willis Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Alfonso Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mayra Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Kip Holbrook(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Meridith Holloway(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Michael Hosford(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Chad Hughes(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jose Huizar(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Laura Huizar(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Ruben Hurtado(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Orlando Ibarra(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Michael Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Sean Kehoe(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Franklin Kempner(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jerry Kenny(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Scott Kidd(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dan Klatt(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Kyle Krall(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Ron Lake(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Devon Lapier(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mike Lapier(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Brent Lehr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Janine Lehr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Alex Llamas(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Luis Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mauro Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Martin Mahmoudi(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Matt Manna(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Elaine Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Frank Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.(pty:pla))(Angwin, Edward)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #20 , Notice of Appearance #18 , REQUEST for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #8 #19 served on August 28, 2019. (Schwartz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC, (Schwartz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #8 filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Schwartz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric B Schwartz on behalf of Defendant Robert Bosch LLC (Attorney Eric B Schwartz added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Schwartz, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07343 MWF(KSx). (rn)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). Due to clerical error. The (3) Conformed filed copy of Proof of Service was docketed in error by the clerk. It belong to another State Court Case Number. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Renee D Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re Notice of Lodging #10 served on 8/26/2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant General Motors LLC on 8/26/2019 re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #8 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bladow, Robyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #8 served on 8/26/2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robyn Bladow) (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Linda Hayes, Rafael Ceja, Frank Marshall, Billy Duckworth, Sean Kehoe, Andy Fok, Elaine Marshall, Ruben Hurtado, Daniel Duffy, Idovino Artifon, Daniel Braun, Amos Gates, Thaddeus Dykier, Michael Hosford, Robert Brenier, Mark Bunker, Mike Lapier, Martin Mahmoudi, Devon Lapier, Mayra Hernandez, Jerry Kenny, Willis Hayes, Luis Lopez, Mike Bulaon, Alfonso Hernandez, David Graham, Ron Lake, Gerando Barron, Dale Hale, Kip Holbrook, Holly Ellis, Kyle Krall, Marcos Cobian, Patricia Belk, Jon Aleka, Calvin Ciapponi, Jose Huizar, Mauro Lopez, Darrell Anderson, Stanley Bronstrup, Franklin Kempner, Ryan Berry, Linda Brubaker, Dan Breckenridge, Michael Jackson, Richard Dyer, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mike Gurtovoy, Robert Ellington, Larry Capatosto, Nick Brannon, Victor Davis, Mark Doty, Casey Dean, Matt Manna, Kevin Harms, Orlando Ibarra, Brent Lehr, Erasmo Garcia, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Robert Garitano, Alex Llamas, Bill Brubaker, Francisco Delacruz, Frank Belk, Scott Kidd, Michael Blankenship, David Fee, John Andrade, Dudley Baker, Dan Klatt, Chad Hughes, Jim Gill, Dustin Coyner, Meridith Holloway, Janine Lehr, David Bell, Jon Barnhart, Solomon Aleka, Laura Huizar, Jose Acevedo, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Raed Ari, upon Defendant Robert Bosch GmbH served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/8/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Linda Hayes, Rafael Ceja, Frank Marshall, Billy Duckworth, Sean Kehoe, Andy Fok, Elaine Marshall, Ruben Hurtado, Daniel Duffy, Idovino Artifon, Daniel Braun, Amos Gates, Thaddeus Dykier, Michael Hosford, Robert Brenier, Mark Bunker, Mike Lapier, Martin Mahmoudi, Devon Lapier, Mayra Hernandez, Jerry Kenny, Willis Hayes, Luis Lopez, Mike Bulaon, Alfonso Hernandez, David Graham, Ron Lake, Gerando Barron, Dale Hale, Kip Holbrook, Holly Ellis, Kyle Krall, Marcos Cobian, Patricia Belk, Jon Aleka, Calvin Ciapponi, Jose Huizar, Mauro Lopez, Darrell Anderson, Stanley Bronstrup, Franklin Kempner, Ryan Berry, Linda Brubaker, Dan Breckenridge, Michael Jackson, Richard Dyer, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mike Gurtovoy, Robert Ellington, Larry Capatosto, Nick Brannon, Victor Davis, Mark Doty, Casey Dean, Matt Manna, Kevin Harms, Orlando Ibarra, Brent Lehr, Erasmo Garcia, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Robert Garitano, Alex Llamas, Bill Brubaker, Francisco Delacruz, Frank Belk, Scott Kidd, Michael Blankenship, David Fee, John Andrade, Dudley Baker, Dan Klatt, Chad Hughes, Jim Gill, Dustin Coyner, Meridith Holloway, Janine Lehr, David Bell, Jon Barnhart, Solomon Aleka, Laura Huizar, Jose Acevedo, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Raed Ari, upon Defendant Robert Bosch LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/8/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Linda Hayes, Rafael Ceja, Frank Marshall, Billy Duckworth, Sean Kehoe, Andy Fok, Elaine Marshall, Ruben Hurtado, Daniel Duffy, Idovino Artifon, Daniel Braun, Amos Gates, Thaddeus Dykier, Michael Hosford, Robert Brenier, Mark Bunker, Mike Lapier, Martin Mahmoudi, Devon Lapier, Mayra Hernandez, Jerry Kenny, Willis Hayes, Luis Lopez, Mike Bulaon, Alfonso Hernandez, David Graham, Ron Lake, Gerando Barron, Dale Hale, Kip Holbrook, Holly Ellis, Kyle Krall, Marcos Cobian, Patricia Belk, Jon Aleka, Calvin Ciapponi, Jose Huizar, Mauro Lopez, Darrell Anderson, Stanley Bronstrup, Franklin Kempner, Ryan Berry, Linda Brubaker, Dan Breckenridge, Michael Jackson, Richard Dyer, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mike Gurtovoy, Robert Ellington, Larry Capatosto, Nick Brannon, Victor Davis, Mark Doty, Casey Dean, Matt Manna, Kevin Harms, Orlando Ibarra, Brent Lehr, Erasmo Garcia, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Robert Garitano, Alex Llamas, Bill Brubaker, Francisco Delacruz, Frank Belk, Scott Kidd, Michael Blankenship, David Fee, John Andrade, Dudley Baker, Dan Klatt, Chad Hughes, Jim Gill, Dustin Coyner, Meridith Holloway, Janine Lehr, David Bell, Jon Barnhart, Solomon Aleka, Laura Huizar, Jose Acevedo, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Raed Ari, upon Defendant General Motors LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/8/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Courtesy Chevrolet Center, General Motors LLC, Paradise Chevrolet, Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Linda Hayes, Rafael Ceja, Frank Marshall, Billy Duckworth, Sean Kehoe, Andy Fok, Elaine Marshall, Ruben Hurtado, Daniel Duffy, Idovino Artifon, Daniel Braun, Amos Gates, Thaddeus Dykier, Michael Hosford, Robert Brenier, Mark Bunker, Mike Lapier, Martin Mahmoudi, Devon Lapier, Mayra Hernandez, Jerry Kenny, Willis Hayes, Luis Lopez, Mike Bulaon, Alfonso Hernandez, David Graham, Ron Lake, Gerando Barron, Dale Hale, Kip Holbrook, Holly Ellis, Kyle Krall, Marcos Cobian, Patricia Belk, Jon Aleka, Calvin Ciapponi, Jose Huizar, Mauro Lopez, Darrell Anderson, Stanley Bronstrup, Franklin Kempner, Ryan Berry, Linda Brubaker, Dan Breckenridge, Michael Jackson, Richard Dyer, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mike Gurtovoy, Robert Ellington, Larry Capatosto, Nick Brannon, Victor Davis, Mark Doty, Casey Dean, Matt Manna, Kevin Harms, Orlando Ibarra, Brent Lehr, Erasmo Garcia, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Robert Garitano, Alex Llamas, Bill Brubaker, Francisco Delacruz, Frank Belk, Scott Kidd, Michael Blankenship, David Fee, John Andrade, Dudley Baker, Dan Klatt, Chad Hughes, Jim Gill, Dustin Coyner, Meridith Holloway, Janine Lehr, David Bell, Jon Barnhart, Solomon Aleka, Laura Huizar, Jose Acevedo, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Raed Ari. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-07350 (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re Notice (Other) #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 served on 8/23/2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow on behalf of Movant General Motors LLC (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant General Motors LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, identifying General Motors Company. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Notice Of Pendency Of Other Actions Pursuant To L.R. 83-1.4.1 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Pending Cases)(Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, Los Angeles County, case number 19CHCV00572 Receipt No: 0973-24316799 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket) (Attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow added to party General Motors LLC(pty:bkmov))(Bladow, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike Bulaon et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Robyn Eileen Bladow
Represented By: Renee D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtesy Chevrolet Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Ryan M Sandrock
Represented By: Eric B Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Lapier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrade
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Huizar
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ceja
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dyer
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Hayes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Ibarra
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ellis
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erasmo Garcia
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raed Ari
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bell
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Brannon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Breckenridge
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marshall
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Doty
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Aleka
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Mahmoudi
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Braun
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Huizar
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Gill
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hayes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Belk
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Cobian
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lopez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Belk
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hughes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Delacruz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Krall
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kidd
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Ciapponi
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Dykier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bunker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Lehr
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kehoe
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Hernandez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Dean
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hale
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Gates
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Allen
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Einhaus
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Lake
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fee
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Marshall
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Capatosto
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ellington
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brubaker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Kempner
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Aleka
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Fok
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hosford
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Davis
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Graham
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Gurtovoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aukes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Curley
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Lopez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acevedo
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Lehr
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Baker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Hurtado
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Klatt
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brubaker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Bronstrup
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kenny
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Coyner
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Holbrook
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blankenship
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Berry
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garitano
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brenier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Lapier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerando Barron
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridith Holloway
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Hernandez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Anderson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Manna
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Duffy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Llamas
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Harms
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Barnhart
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idovino Artifon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Duckworth
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Bulaon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?