Sonya Boyd v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sonya Boyd
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv07380
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sonya Boyd, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (hr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 POS)(Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (see document for details) (hr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Social Security) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (kl)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Granting REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #3 . (kl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Sonya Boyd. (lh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sonya Boyd, (lh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Filed by Plaintiff Sonya Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonya Boyd v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?