Samir Ibraheem v. Burgerim Group USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Samir Ibraheem
Defendant: Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07399
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 66 Mail Returned addressed to Burgerim Group USA Inc re Default Judgment,, #64 (mrgo)
July 13, 2020 Filing 65 Mail Returned addressed to Burgerim Group USA Inc re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 62 (mrgo)
June 24, 2020 Filing 63 Mail Returned addressed to Burgerim Group USA, Inc. re Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #59 . (et)
June 23, 2020 Filing 64 DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson : Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2), the Court enters a default a default judgment in the principal amount of $90,000, plus attorneys fees in the amount of $5,225.00 and costs in the amount of $400.00, in favor of Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem and against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.attorneys fees of $5,225.00, costs of $400.00 for a total judgment of $95,625.00. Related to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. #60 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiff #60 ; and REQUEST for Leave of Seth W. Wiener to Appear for Telephone filed by Plaintiff - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. The request is denied as moot. The jury trial and pretrial conference are vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 22, 2020 Filing 61 REQUEST for Leave of Seth W. Wiener to Appear for Telephone filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Request set for hearing on 6/29/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiener, Seth)
May 28, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Seth W. Wiener, #3 Declaration Samir Ibraheem, #4 Proposed Order Judgment, #5 Proof of Service) (Wiener, Seth)
May 28, 2020 Filing 59 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Burgerim Group USA, Inc. (mrgo)
May 12, 2020 Filing 58 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc., REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Wiener, Seth)
April 27, 2020 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc., re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel served on 4/27/2020. (Davidovich, Niv)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER re MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich and Charlie Z.Stein to Withdraw as Attorney #48 #49 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Good cause having been shown, the Court grants Defendant's Counsel's motions to withdraw as attorney #48 #49 . As it has been repeatedly advised, Defendant may not appear without counsel. Therefore, if Defendant fails to obtain new counsel on or before May 11, 2020, it will be subject to default. In light of General Order 20-05, the jury trial is continued until July 21, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., with pretrial on July 13, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Defendant's Counsel is ordered to notify Defendant in writing of this Court's order within 3 days. (lom)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The requests to appear by telephone are granted. The attorneys appearing by phone shall email the clerk, no later than 04/10/2020, at paul_cruz@cacd.uscourts.gov, with a telephone number the Court can call to connect them for the proceeding. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Leave of Charlie Z. Stein to Appear for Telephonic Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #50 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Lodging. The image attached to this entry is a proposed order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
April 2, 2020 Filing 53 REQUEST for Leave of Seth W. Wiener to Appear for Telephone filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Request set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiener, Seth)
April 2, 2020 Filing 52 Opposition Opposition re: Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich and Charlie Z. Stein to Withdraw as Attorney #49 filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
April 2, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST for Leave of Charlie Z. Stein to Appear for Telephonic Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #50 (Davidovich, Niv)
April 1, 2020 Filing 50 REQUEST for Leave of Charlie Z. Stein to Appear for Telephonic Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davidovich, Niv)
April 1, 2020 Filing 49 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich and Charlie Z. Stein to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Buchbut, #2 Proposed Order) (Davidovich, Niv)
April 1, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich and Charlie Z. Stein to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Buchbut, #2 Proposed Order) (Davidovich, Niv)
April 1, 2020 Filing 47 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 04/27/2020 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 5/4/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 8, 2020 Filing 46 MINUTES OF #30 MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant; #35 MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Hearing held. The motions are denied. The Court orders the trial dates continued for three months, and sets the following dates: Jury Trial - May 5, 2020 at 9:00 a.m.; Pretrial Conference - April 27, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lom)
January 6, 2020 Filing 45 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney #30 , and MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney #35 - Hearing on the motions previously scheduled for 01/27/2020 at 1:30 p.m. are advanced to 1/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff's counsel is granted leave to appear by telephone. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 5, 2020 Filing 44 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 43 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated - Clean set) filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem.. (Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 41 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem.. (Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 40 Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem.. (Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST for Leave of Seth W. Wiener to Appear for Telephone filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Request set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiener, Seth)
January 5, 2020 Filing 37 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney #35 filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 REQUEST for Leave of Charlie Z. Stein to Appear for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel via Telephone filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request to Appear at Hearing on Motion to Withdraw via Telephone) (Davidovich, Niv)
January 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Niv V. Davidovich, #2 Declaration of Michel Buchbut, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Wtihdraw as Counsel of Record) (Davidovich, Niv)
January 3, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #30 filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. (Davidovich, Niv)
January 3, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney #30 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The document is accepted as filed. (et)
January 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 31 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney #30 filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
January 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Niv V. Davidovich to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davidovich, Niv)
December 16, 2019 Filing 29 WRIT of of Attachment issued. The pending APPLICATION for Writ of of Attachment #28 has been terminated. (ib)
December 13, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Writ of of Attachment , APPLICATION for Order for Attachment filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
December 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Undertaking and Request for Issuance of Writ of Attachment filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Writ of Attachment)(Wiener, Seth)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order re Plaintiff's Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (ECF No. #12 ) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. the Court finds that requirements of the California Code of Civil Procedure have been met, and Plaintiff's Application for a right to attach order against Defendant is GRANTED in the amount of $90,000.00. Plaintiff must file an undertaking in the amount of $10,000.00 before the writ of attachment will issue. (See document for details.) (sbou)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTES OF HRG: RE PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT #12 held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Hearing held telephonically re Plaintiffs Application for Writ of Attachment. The matter is submitted. Court Recorder: XTR 11/12/19. (sbou)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting #20 Request to Allow plaintiff's attorney Seth W. Wiener to appear by telephone at the hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, scheduled for 11/12/19 at 10:00AM. (ib)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference previously scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 11:00 a.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Jury Trial is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference set for 1/27/2020 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST to Appeal in forma pauperis , First REQUEST for Leave of Charlie Z. Stein to Appear for Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request to Appear at Hearing on Right to Attach Order by Telephone) (Davidovich, Niv)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST for Leave of Seth W. Wiener to Appear for Telephone filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Request set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Wiener, Seth)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF SAMIR IBRAHEEM'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #15 Motion for Leave to Appear of Seth W. Wiener as 11/4/19 for Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (mrgo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST for Leave of Charlie Z. Stein to Appear for Status Conference via Telephone filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Davidovich, Niv)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY in support of APPLICATION for Order for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment #12 filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 to Application for Right to Attach Order Opposition re: APPLICATION for Order for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment #12 filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc.. (Davidovich, Niv)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Leave of Seth W. Wiener to Appear for Telephone filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Request set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Wiener, Seth)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Continuing Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Right toAttach Order and Writ of Attachment (ECF No. #12 ) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment Against Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc., noticed before the District Judge on November 4, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., is continued to Tuesday, November 12, 2019, at 10 a.m., before the Magistrate Judge, in the Roybal Federal Building, Courtroom 780, Seventh Floor, 255East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Defendant shall file its opposition no later than October 22, 2019, and Plaintiff shall file any reply no later than October 29, 2019. (et)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION for Order for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment #12 by Clerk of Court. District Judge's name is misspelled. Improperly noticed before District Judge. (mrgo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Order for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. Application set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Samir ibraheem, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Wiener, Seth)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/4/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc., identifying BURGERIM GROUP USA INC.. (Davidovich, Niv)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc..(Attorney Niv Vladimir Davidovich added to party Burgerim Group USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Davidovich, Niv)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. (et)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem, identifying None. (Wiener, Seth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Wiener, Seth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24330056 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Samir Ibraheem. (Attorney Seth W Wiener added to party Samir Ibraheem(pty:pla))(Wiener, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samir Ibraheem v. Burgerim Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Ibraheem
Represented By: Seth W Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerim Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Niv Vladimir Davidovich
Represented By: Charles Z Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?