Lynne Bodge v. United Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: Lynne Bodge
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation, Cytec Industries, Inc., Metroplitan Life Insurance Company, Evra, Inc., Henkel Corp, DOES 1-450, Wyeth Holdings Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Northrop Grumman Corporation, Cirrus Enterprises LLC and American Cyanamid Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv07411
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/11/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on October 7, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: March 23, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: March 27, 2020. (iv)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 12, filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation.. (Garratt, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 Defendant Shell Oil Company's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Shell Oil Company, Shell Petroleum Inc., Shell Petroleum NV, Royal Dutch Shell plc. (Petty, Ross)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Ross M. Petty Re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Petty, Ross)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Shell Oil Company's Notice of Re-Filing Its State Court Answer filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company. (Petty, Ross)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ross M Petty on behalf of Defendant Shell Oil Company (Attorney Ross M Petty added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Petty, Ross)
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Edward E. Hartley re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #22 Regarding Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Cirrus Enterprises LLC. (Hartley, Edward)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to F.R.C.P. No. 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Cirrus Enterprises LLC (Hartley, Edward)
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Defendant Cirrus Enterprises LLC's Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Cirrus Enterprises LLC. (Hartley, Edward)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Cirrus Enterprises LLC.(Attorney Edward E Hartley added to party Cirrus Enterprises LLC(pty:dft))(Hartley, Edward)
September 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Henkel Corp (FILED IN STATE COURT (6/28/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #20 .) (iv)
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC SERVICE filed by Defendant Henkel Corp. (Baravarian, Tina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by DEFENDANT Henkel Corp. (Baravarian, Tina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Henkel Corp (Baravarian, Tina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian on behalf of Defendant Henkel Corp (Attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian added to party Henkel Corp(pty:dft))(Baravarian, Tina)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Peter A. Strotz , Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Wyeth Holdings Corporation. (Strotz, Peter)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation, re Supplement, #14 , Declaration #15 served on September 5, 2019. (Garratt, Justin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lance D. Wilson Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. (Garratt, Justin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-A thru 1-I, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-J thru 1-N, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-O thru 1-BB)(Garratt, Justin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vincent Frank Tremonti, II on behalf of Defendant Wyeth Holdings Corporation (Attorney Vincent Frank Tremonti, II added to party Wyeth Holdings Corporation(pty:dft))(Tremonti, Vincent)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wyeth Holdings Corporation, identifying Pfizer Inc., Cytec Industries Inc.. (Lawless, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Notice of Refiling of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Wyeth Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Answer to Complaint)(Attorney John R Lawless, Jr added to party Wyeth Holdings Corporation(pty:dft))(Lawless, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #9 served on September 3, 2019. (Garratt, Justin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation.(Garratt, Justin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 7, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 23, 2019. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (See order for further details) (yl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil)
August 27, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Lynne Bodge in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/19/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on August 27, 2019. (Garratt, Justin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation (Garratt, Justin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. (Garratt, Justin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV13570 Receipt No: 0973-24330973 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Justin E Garratt added to party United Technologies Corporation(pty:dft))(Garratt, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynne Bodge v. United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Bodge
Represented By: Jessica M Dean
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Justin E Garratt
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cytec Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metroplitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corp
Represented By: David M Uchida
Represented By: Trenton Elmer Hartzler
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Tina Ladan Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-450
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Peter A Strotz
Represented By: John R Lawless, Jr
Represented By: Vincent Frank Tremonti, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Ross M Petty
Represented By: Aaron M Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirrus Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Barry N Endick
Represented By: Edward E Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cyanamid Company
Represented By: Peter A Strotz
Represented By: John R Lawless, Jr
Represented By: Vincent Frank Tremonti, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?