Glenn Pawlik v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Glenn Pawlik
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv07441
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Glenn Pawlik, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/9/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case is designated for electronic filing. See Local Rule 5-4. When a proposed order or other proposed document is lodged or accompanies a filing, a WordPerfect or Word copy of the proposed order or other proposed document shall also be e-mailed to: JC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (See document for details.) (et)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (et)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Glenn Pawlik, (Ruzin, Irene)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Glenn Pawlik. (Ruzin, Irene)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Glenn Pawlik. (Ruzin, Irene)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24336759 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Glenn Pawlik. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Glenn Pawlik(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn Pawlik v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Pawlik
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?