Rossana Figuerola v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rossana Figuerola
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv07491
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference #20 . Scheduling Conference continued to 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (twdb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.. (Pelanda, Brian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 11/7/2019 to 11/14/2019 filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wideman, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Remand Case to Superior Court Santa Barbara #13 , currently set for hearing on October 24, 2019, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Barbara Superior Court Cook Division #13 Reply to Oppoisition filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola. (Wideman, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed 10/9/2019 re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #16 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court -Cook Division #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wideman, Richard)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Barbara Superior Court Cook Division #13 filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian Pelanda)(Pelanda, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal #12 , the Motion to Remand #11 is terminated; the Motion to Remand at #13 will proceed as noticed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Barbara Superior Court Cook Division filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Wideman, Richard)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court -Cook Division #11 filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Wideman, Richard)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court -Cook Division filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Wideman, Richard)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07491 FMO(MAAx). (rn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
August 29, 2019 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, attached as Exhibit D.(jtil)
August 29, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
August 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company in Santa Barbara Superior Court on 2/11/2019, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
August 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rossana Figuerola in Santa Barbara Superior Court on 11/28/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, of Notice to Adverse Parties and Court of Removal to Federal Court served on 08/29/2019. (Pelanda, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company identifying Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Pelanda, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, identifying Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Pelanda, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Pelanda, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara County Superior Court, case number 18CV05839 Receipt No: 0973-24350151 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Attorney Brian L Pelanda added to party Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Pelanda, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossana Figuerola v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossana Figuerola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian L Pelanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?