Epic Produce Sales, LLC v. Fresh Growers Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Epic Produce Sales, LLC and Five Crowns Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Inoscencio Perez and Fresh Growers Group Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07580
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 filed by Defendants Inoscencio Perez, Fresh Growers Group Inc..(Attorney Louis P Dell added to party Fresh Growers Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Dell added to party Inoscencio Perez(pty:dft))(Dell, Louis)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #9 as to defendants Fresh Growers Group Inc., Inoscencio Perez. (jp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Botta, Bartholomew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 filed by Plaintiffs Epic Produce Sales, LLC, Five Crowns Marketing, Inc.. (Botta, Bartholomew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Epic Produce Sales, LLC, Five Crowns Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Bartholomew M Botta added to party Five Crowns Marketing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Botta, Bartholomew)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Fresh Growers Group Inc., Inoscencio Perez. (esa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Epic Produce Sales, LLC. (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Epic Produce Sales, LLC, (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Epic Produce Sales, LLC. (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24361235 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Epic Produce Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Bartholomew M Botta added to party Epic Produce Sales, LLC(pty:pla))(Botta, Bartholomew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Produce Sales, LLC v. Fresh Growers Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Produce Sales, LLC
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Represented By: June T Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Five Crowns Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inoscencio Perez
Represented By: Louis P Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Growers Group Inc.
Represented By: Louis P Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?