Ariana Grande-Butera et al v. Forever 21, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Ariana Grande-Butera p/k/a Ariana Grande and GrandAri, Inc. alleged that defendants Forever 21, Inc. and Riley Rose LLC used her name, image, likeness and music without authorization to promote their brands and products by hiring a look-alike model and posting photos of that model in clothing and accessories that resemble clothing worn in Ariana Grande's music videos.

Plaintiff: GrandAri Inc. and Ariana Grande-Butera
Defendant: Riley Rose LLC, Does 1-10, inclusive and Forever 21, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07600
Filed: September 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE STAYED PURSUANT TO THE AUTOMATIC BANKRUPTCY STAY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On October 17, 2019, Defendants Forever 21, Inc. and Riley Rose, LLC filed a Notice of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings indicating that on September 29, 2019, Defendants filed voluntary petitions for relief under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code, which are currently pending in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware #19 . Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Ariana Grande-Butera and GrandAri, Inc. show cause in writing no later than October 28, 2019 why this action should not be stayed pursuant to the automatic bankruptcy stay under 11 U.S.C. 362(a). Failure to timely respond to this Order shall be deemed consent to a stay pending the bankruptcy actions. (kti)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcyand Automatic Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Riley Rose LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raygor, Kent)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #17 served on September 27, 2019. (Lucas, Amy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #13 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Forever 21, Inc. and Riley Rose, LLC's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/8/2019, to allow the parties to continue meaningful settlement discussions. (gk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 12-02 filed on 9/24/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-7600-DMG (KSx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-CV-7600 DMG (KSx). (esa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 8, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lucas, Amy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United states Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Riley Rose LLC (Raygor, Kent)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Riley Rose LLC, (Attorney Kent R Raygor added to party Forever 21, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kent R Raygor added to party Riley Rose LLC(pty:dft))(Raygor, Kent)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ariana Grande-Butera, GrandAri Inc., upon Defendant Forever 21, Inc. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Riley Rose LLC served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Forever 21, Inc. and Riley Rose, LLC. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lucas, Amy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Riley Rose LLC. (lh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
September 2, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
September 2, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
September 2, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera, (Petrocelli, Daniel)
September 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
September 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs GrandAri Inc., Ariana Grande-Butera. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
September 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24364455 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ariana Grande-Butera, GrandAri Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party GrandAri Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Ariana Grande-Butera(pty:pla))(Petrocelli, Daniel)
September 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24364455 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ariana Grande-Butera, GrandAri Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party GrandAri Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Ariana Grande-Butera(pty:pla))(Petrocelli, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariana Grande-Butera et al v. Forever 21, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GrandAri Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Maya Zagayer
Represented By: Amy Riley Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Grande-Butera
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Maya Zagayer
Represented By: Amy Riley Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Rose LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?