Jay McClure v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Jay McClure
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation a District of Columbia Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 2:2019cv07699
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #8 served on 9/9/19. (Shirvanian, Sevag)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 , Notice (Other), #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 served on September 6, 2019. (Shirvanian, Sevag)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other), #2 . The following error(s) was found: A claim initiating document was filed using a non-claim initiating event in CM/ECF. As a result, the case was not properly classified in the CM/ECF system. The error has been corrected by re-docketing the claim initiating document using the correct event. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCKET BY CLERK*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV25710 Receipt No: 0973-24386161 - Fee:$400, filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sevag Shirvanian, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint,Civil Cover Sheet and Addendum and Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Exhibit C - Conformed Copy of Answer, #5 Declaration of Patricia Boggs, #6 Declaration of Abigail Johnson) (lh)
September 5, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jay McClure. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/23/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 5, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/04/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation's Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak, identifying Jay McClure, National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak, Matthew E. Roston, Roston Law Group, APC. Littler Mendelson, P.C.. (Attorney Sevag M Shirvanian added to party National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak(pty:dft))(Shirvanian, Sevag)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak. (Shirvanian, Sevag)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak (Shirvanian, Sevag)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sevag Shirvanian, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint,Civil Cover Sheet and Addendum and Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Exhibit C - Conformed Copy of Answer, #5 Declaration of Patricia Boggs, #6 Declaration of Abigail Johnson)(Shirvanian, Sevag)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak. (Shirvanian, Sevag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay McClure v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak
Represented By: Sevag M Shirvanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Brandie N Charles
Represented By: Sevag M Shirvanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation a District of Columbia Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Brandie N Charles
Represented By: Sevag M Shirvanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay McClure
Represented By: Matthew Ellsworth Roston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?