In Re Moshe Michael A. Perry
Plaintiff: Moshe Michael A. Perry
Defendant: Costco Wholesale LLC, Dupure Int'l Coo, Alter Ego Balance Energy LLC, Patrick Dalee, Eco Water, Dupure International Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Co. and DOES 1 through 10 known and unknown Defendants
Case Number: 2:2019cv07731
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Amended Proof of Service #24 , for the following reasons: (1) Title page is missing. (2) All documents shall have a title/caption page. Plaintiff shall re-file the document with a title/caption page pursuant to L.R. 11-3.8 no later than 11/7/2019. (jp)
November 2, 2019 Filing 24 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 11/4/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #25 ] - AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. Amendment to Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed,, #19 (Perry, Moshe) Modified on 11/4/2019 (jp).
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant XL Specialty Insurance Co, Does 1 through 10 known and unknown filed by plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (es)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Costco Wholesale LLC (and Joint Venture Partners) filed by plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (es)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Dupure International Inc, Alter Ego Balance Energy LLC; Dupure Int'l Coo, Patrick Dalee filed by plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (es) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/31/2019) (es).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: MOOT. #17 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. (See Dkt. #11 and #14 . (jp) Modified on 10/29/2019 (jp).
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry, upon Defendants, Dupure Int'l Coo, Alter Ego Balance Energy LLC, (Part of Marmon Group) and COO Patrick Dalee acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019;. Acknowledgment of Service signed by NOT indicated, Not indicated. Note: Receipt of Acknowledgment by DuPure Counsel on 10/15/2019 - FRCP 41(d)(10(F), FRCP 4(K)(10 - Phone call from 949-798-2167. Copy of USPS Tracking attached. (jp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry, upon Defendant XL Specialty Insurance Co. for Costco Wholesale, acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Missing name of person accepted served on behalf of defendant XL Specialty insurance Co. for Costsco Wholesale SIGNED on the Acknowledgment of Service. A Copy of USPS Tracking attached. (jp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (jp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE OF September 27, 2019 Revoking the Order of September 20, 2019 is Invalid, Null and Void as it did not add Three (3) Days of Service Pursuant to Follow FRCP, Rule 6(D): Computing and Extending Time; Time for Motion Papers. (With Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jp)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The initial order granting pro se litigant, Moshe Michael A. Perry, permission to electronically file has been REVOKED for failure to comply with the Court's order (see Docket Entry No. #14 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #11 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: The Court cannot determine with certainty the likelihood of success on the merits. The Court believes that Plaintiff has the ability to articulate his claims without the assistance of counsel. Neither the facts nor the legal issues involved in this case are unusually complex. Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel is therefore DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Nothing in this Order is intended to preclude Plaintiff from retaining counsel on his own. (see document for further details) #9 (klg)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: GRANTED. #10 (klg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (bm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 VERIFIED APPLICATION BY THE COMPLAINANT FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT AN ATTORNEY FOR SUCH COMPLAINANT AND AUTHORIZE THE COMMENCEMENT OF THE ACTION WITHOUT THE PAYMENT OF FEES, COSTS, UNDER 4Z U.S.C. Section 2040e-5(x(1);DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (bm)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-08091 FMO (MRWx) (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED (see comments above). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall pay the filing fees in full or file an amended application within 30 days or the case will be dismissed. (lom)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry against Defendants Alter Ego Balance Energy LLC, Costco Wholesale LLC, Patrick Dalee, Dupure Int'l Coo, Dupure International Inc., Eco Water, XL Specialty Insurance Co. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Moshe Michael A. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupure Int'l Coo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alter Ego Balance Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dalee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupure International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 known and unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Michael A. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?